Miller v. Legacy Bank
Plaintiff: Marquise Miller
Defendant: Legacy Bank
Case Number: 5:2020cv00946
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie L Bloyd on behalf of Legacy Bank (Bloyd, Jamie)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking #4 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/5/20. (kmt)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Marquise Miller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Amended Complaint)(kmt)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Legacy Bank. (kmt)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Marquise Miller in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500081946 regarding #1 Complaint (kmt)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Legacy Bank filed by Marquise Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Legacy Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquise Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Bank
Represented By: Jamie L Bloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?