Pratt v. Wal-Mart
Plaintiff: Ryan Preston Pratt
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Case Number: 5:2020cv00972
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ryan Preston Pratt. (Shadid, Danny)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of Ryan Preston Pratt (Shadid, Danny)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 09:15 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 11/24/2020. (llg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart.(Brewer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart (Scott, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart . (Brewer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart. (Brewer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart (Brewer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3300357. (Brewer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-20-226 filed by Wal-Mart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6- Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 7- Amended Petition, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Preston Pratt
Represented By: Gregory S Wilson
Represented By: Danny K Shadid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?