Hill v. Adkins et al
Plaintiff: Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr
Defendant: FNU Adkins and FNU Parnel
Case Number: 5:2020cv01007
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by Plaintiff Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter Requesting Documents, #2 Envelope)(knt)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. The undersigned recommends that the Court dismiss this case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2020. This report and recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/17/20. (lb)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $12.17 on or before 11/10/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/20/20. (lb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 2 SUMMONS(ES) by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter)(knt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Money Receipts with Gift Cards, #2 Exhibit 2- Resident Transactions, #3 Envelope)(knt)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court orders Plaintiff to cure by 10/27/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/6/20. (lb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/05/2020. (knt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases. (knt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resident Transaction Details, #2 Envelope)(knt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Adkins, FNU Parnel filed by Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Adkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Parnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Dewayne Hill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?