Twins et al v. Capital Link Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thalia Twins and Lucian Twins
Defendant: John Doe and Capital Link Management LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01020
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Capital Link Management LLC . (Little, Brendan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Capital Link Management LLC . (Little, Brendan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendan H Little on behalf of Capital Link Management LLC (Little, Brendan)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ~ re #6 Disclosure Statement - Corporate filed by Capital Link Management LLC. Defendant Capital Link Management, LLC's filing #6 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with LCvR 7.1.1 and Defendant Capital Link Management, LLC is hereby ordered to file a compliant disclosure statement. Additionally, Defendant's counsel, Brendan H. Little, has not filed an entry of appearance in compliance with LCvR83.4. The Court hereby orders Brendan H. Little to file his entry of appearance. Both filings required by this Order shall be submitted no later than December 4, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 11/30/2020. (dwl)
November 28, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Capital Link Management LLC . (Little, Brendan)
November 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Link Management LLC.(Little, Brendan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thalia Twins, Lucian Twins. Capital Link Management LLC served on 11/5/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Sergei Lemberg on behalf of Lucian Twins, Thalia Twins (Lemberg, Sergei)
October 8, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3320835. (Lemberg, Sergei)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Capital Link Management LLC. (knt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Link Management LLC, John Doe filed by Thalia Twins, Lucian Twins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twins et al v. Capital Link Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Link Management LLC
Represented By: Brendan H Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thalia Twins
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucian Twins
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?