Solberg v. Vice Capital Extraction LLC
Plaintiff: Justin Solberg
Defendant: Vice Capital Extraction LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Lotus Gold Dispensary
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Vice Capital Extraction LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Respond Flow, LLC d/b/a Respond Flow, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01039
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Respond Flow, LLC d/b/a Respond Flow, Inc. filed by All Defendants.(Watts, Weston)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 10:20 AM telephonically before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (jb)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Watts, Weston)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Weston O Watts on behalf of All Defendants (Watts, Weston)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Solberg. Vice Capital Extraction LLC served on 10/15/2020. (Shamis, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3329546. (Shamis, Andrew)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Vice Capital Extraction LLC. (rb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vice Capital Extraction LLC filed by Justin Solberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solberg v. Vice Capital Extraction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Solberg
Represented By: Andrew J Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Capital Extraction LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Lotus Gold Dispensary
Represented By: Weston O Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Vice Capital Extraction LLC
Represented By: Weston O Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Respond Flow, LLC d/b/a Respond Flow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?