Barton et al v. Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc
Plaintiff: Julie Barton, Kenny Barton and Katie Barton
Defendant: Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01098
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas Patrick Goresen, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Goresen, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 10:45 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (llg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 First Amended Petition)(Woolery, J)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by J Todd Woolery on behalf of All Defendants (Woolery, J)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc . (Cole, Jodi)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jodi C Cole on behalf of Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc (Cole, Jodi)
October 29, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3353432. (Cole, Jodi)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court for Kingfisher County, case number CJ-2020-00065 filed by Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons., #3 Exhibit 3- Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit 4- Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5- Petition, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton et al v. Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Barton
Represented By: Anthony J Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Barton
Represented By: Anthony J Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Barton
Represented By: Anthony J Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc
Represented By: J Todd Woolery
Represented By: Thomas P Goresen
Represented By: Jodi C Cole
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Goresen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?