Del City Joint Venture LLC v. Del City City of
Plaintiff: Del City Joint Venture LLC
Defendant: Del City City of
Case Number: 5:2020cv01121
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 ENTER ORDER re #6 Docket. In light of the Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Del City Joint Venture LLC, [Doc. No. 8], the Status/Scheduling conference scheduled for Wednesday January 6, 2021, at 9:15 a.m., is STRICKEN. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/29/20. (jw)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Responses due by 1/11/2021. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/28/20. (jw)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Del City City of. (Wood, Randall)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Del City Joint Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Relevant portions of the Oklahoma Floodplain Management Act, #2 Exhibit 2-Relevant portions of Defendant's Code of Ordinances)(Schwartz, Mason)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Mason J Schwartz on behalf of Del City Joint Venture LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:15 AM via Conference Call before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (jw)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Del City City of.(Schreck, Charles)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Del City City of in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500082700 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (knt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles A Schreck on behalf of Del City City of (Schreck, Charles)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Wood on behalf of Del City City of (Wood, Randall)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-4707 filed by Del City Joint Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet CJ-2020-4704, #2 Exhibit 2 - EOA - David Box, Mason Schwartz & C Hahn for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 3 - App for Hrg on Motion for Writ of Mandamus, #4 Exhibit 4 - Petition for Decl. Judg. & Mtn Writ of Mandamus, #5 Exhibit 5 - Aff of Service by Certified Mail, #6 Exhibit 6 -EOA - CAS - City of Del City, #7 Exhibit 7 -EOA - RJW - City of Del City, #8 Exhibit 8 - Unopp Motion of Def for Ext of Time to Respond to Pet, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Mtn to Extend Answer Date, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del City Joint Venture LLC v. Del City City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del City City of
Represented By: Randall J Wood
Represented By: Charles A Schreck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del City Joint Venture LLC
Represented By: Cooper T Hahn
Represented By: Mason J Schwartz
Represented By: David M Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?