Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC v. Marathon Oil Company
Plaintiff: Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01148
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/29/20. (wh)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE (other) by Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Combs, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Notice of Removal)(Combs, Eric)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs Corrected Disclosure Statement. (Combs, Eric)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Marathon Oil Company . (Brown, L)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC . (Jordan, Will)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC.(Jordan, Will)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Will Jordan on behalf of Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC (Jordan, Will)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric L Combs on behalf of Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC (Combs, Eric)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC by Marathon Oil Company.(Brown, L)
November 13, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3376720. (Brown, L)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2020-501 filed by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court EOA Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA ROT Marathon, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Docket as of 11.12.2020, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC v. Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Elisabeth D Brown
Represented By: L Vance Brown
Represented By: Amy C Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Resources - NonOp LLC
Represented By: Eric L Combs
Represented By: Will T Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?