Great Lakes Insurance SE v. Ryans Trucking Inc et al
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Defendant: Insurica of Lawton, Ryans Trucking Inc, Stephen D Ryans, Ryans Moving and Storage Inc, Insurica Inc, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Internal Revenue Service and Donald E Ryans, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01157
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Oklahoma Tax Commission.(Laks, Lorena)
December 31, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Internal Revenue Service.(Laks, Lorena)
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, of Defendant United States of America ex rel Internal Revenue Service by Insurica Inc, Insurica of Lawton, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC.(Donchin, David)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Crossclaim of Oklahoma Tax Commission by Insurica Inc, Insurica of Lawton, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC.(Donchin, David)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Joint Crossclaim of Insurica of Lawton, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC, and Insurica, Inc. by Internal Revenue Service.(Cohen, Priyanka)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Crossclaim by Internal Revenue Service.(Cohen, Priyanka)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Petition for Interpleader, CROSSCLAIM against Ryans Moving and Storage Inc, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC, Ryans Trucking Inc, Insurica Inc, Donald E Ryans, Jr, Insurica of Lawton, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Stephen D Ryans, COUNTERCLAIM against Great Lakes Insurance SE by Internal Revenue Service.(Cohen, Priyanka)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Priyanka Dhirajlal Cohen on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Cohen, Priyanka)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against Great Lakes Insurance SE, Insurica Inc, Insurica of Lawton, Internal Revenue Service, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC, Donald E Ryans, Jr, Stephen D Ryans, Ryans Moving and Storage Inc, Ryans Trucking Inc filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission.(Laks, Lorena)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven V Buckman on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance SE (Buckman, Steven)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ~ Granting #7 Defendant Oklahoma Tax Commission Ex Rel.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend Cross-Claim. Defendant Oklahoma Tax Commission shall file its amended cross-claim within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 12/3/2020. (dwl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Oklahoma Tax Commission. (Laks, Lorena)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lorena M Laks on behalf of Oklahoma Tax Commission (Laks, Lorena)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Insurica Inc, Insurica of Lawton, North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC.(Donchin, David)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ~ Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant United States shall answer or otherwise move with respect to the Petition on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 11/25/2020. (dwl)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Internal Revenue Service. (Cohen, Priyanka)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Donald E Ryans, Jr, Stephen D Ryans, Ryans Moving and Storage Inc, Ryans Trucking Inc. (knt)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Comanche County District Court, case number CJ-2020-415 filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Interpleader, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer and Cross-Claim of North American and the Insurica Defendants, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant State of Oklahoma ex. rel. Oklahoma Tax Commissions Answer and Cross-Claim, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendant State of Oklahoma ex. rel. Oklahoma Tax Commissions First Discovery Request to Plaintiff Great Lakes Insurance, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Attachment 1 - Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Insurance SE v. Ryans Trucking Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurica of Lawton
Represented By: David B Donchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryans Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D Ryans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryans Moving and Storage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurica Inc
Represented By: David B Donchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Insurance Agency of Lawton LLC
Represented By: David B Donchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Tax Commission
Represented By: Lorena M Laks
Represented By: Miles G Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Priyanka Dhirajlal Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E Ryans, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Steven V Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?