Dennis v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Terri Dennis
Defendant: John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company and John Hancock Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01176
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by John Hancock Life Insurance Company, John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company . (Williams, Paula)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by John Hancock Life Insurance Company, John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company.(Williams, Paula)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ~ Granting #3 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 13, 2021. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 12/22/2020. (dwl)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of All Defendants (Leffel, Lance)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Paula M Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Paula)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Hancock Life Insurance Company, John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company. (Williams, Paula)
November 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3401814. (McGrew, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Hancock Life Insurance Company, John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company. (knt)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Hancock Life Insurance Company, John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company filed by Terri Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Dennis
Represented By: Michael D McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Represented By: Paula M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Represented By: Paula M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?