TZ's Treasures LLC et al v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Terri Dennis and TZ's Treasures LLC
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01177
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Covington Specialty Insurance Company.(Gibbs, James)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Covington Specialty Insurance Company . (Gibbs, James)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by James L Gibbs, II on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Gibbs, James)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robin D McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Robin)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew M McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Matthew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (McGrew, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff TZ's Treasures, L.L.C. has not filed a separate "Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of LLC or Partnership" in compliance with LCvR7.1.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. LCvR7.1.1 requires a party formed as a limited liability company or partnership to file a separate statement concurrently with its first filing in the case meeting the requirements of LCvR7.1.1.1 This Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff TZ's Treasures, L.L.C. to file within 7 days of this Order its separate Disclosure Statement complying with LCvR7.1.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 12/01/2020. (nv)
November 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3401818. (McGrew, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (em)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Covington Specialty Insurance Company filed by TZ's Treasures LLC, Terri Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TZ's Treasures LLC et al v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Dennis
Represented By: Michael D McGrew
Represented By: Robin D McGrew
Represented By: Matthew M McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TZ's Treasures LLC
Represented By: Michael D McGrew
Represented By: Robin D McGrew
Represented By: Matthew M McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: James L Gibbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?