Altus City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Altus City of
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, CVS Health Corporation, Activas PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01180
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 25, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Altus City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/20/2021. (llg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (to file Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy) Modified on 1/20/2021 (llg).
January 12, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 12, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Expedite of Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 7, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 4, 2021 Filing 32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 177, #8 Exhibit 8 - WI Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - CA Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - JPML 7713, #24 Exhibit 24 - JPML 8583, #25 Exhibit 25 - Harmon Transfer Order, #26 Exhibit 26 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #27 Exhibit 27 - City of Portland v. Purdue, #28 Exhibit 28 - EDVA Stay Order, #29 Exhibit 29 - WDVA Stay Order, #30 Exhibit 30 - CA Stay Order, #31 Exhibit 31 - IL Stay Order, #32 Exhibit 32 - FL Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 4, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
December 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite by Altus City of. (Court, Todd)
December 22, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand by Altus City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
December 10, 2020 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Elliot P Anderson on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Anderson, Elliot)
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Defendant, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/3/2020. (llg)
December 3, 2020 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/2/2020. (llg)
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/30/2020. (llg)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Limited f/k/a Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/30/2020. (llg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Corrected) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet - Jackson Co, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summons-Anda Pharma, #4 Exhibit Summons-Amerisourcebergen, #5 Exhibit Summons-Actavis LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons-Actavis Pharma Inc, #7 Exhibit Summons-Actavis PLC, #8 Exhibit Summons-Allergan PLC, #9 Exhibit Summons-Anda Inc, #10 Exhibit Summons-Cardinal, #11 Exhibit Summons-Cephalon, #12 Exhibit Summons-CVS Health Corp, #13 Exhibit Summons-Pharmacy, #14 Exhibit Summons-Endo Health Inc, #15 Exhibit Summons-Endo Pharma Inc, #16 Exhibit Summons-Harvard, #17 Exhibit Summons-J&J, #18 Exhibit Summons-Janssen Pharma Inc, #19 Exhibit Summons-Janssen Pharma Inc, #20 Exhibit Summons-Keysource, #21 Exhibit Summons-McKesson, #22 Exhibit Summons-Morris & Dickson, #23 Exhibit Summons-OK CVS, #24 Exhibit Summons-Ortho-McNeil, #25 Exhibit Summons-Quest, #26 Exhibit Summons-Teva Pharma USA, #27 Exhibit Summons-Walgreens Boots, #28 Exhibit Summons-Watson Labs Inc, #29 Exhibit Summons-Watson Pharma Inc, #30 Exhibit Summons-Watson Pharma, #31 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Ext, #32 Exhibit Appearance-McKesson, #33 Exhibit Appearance-Quest, #34 Exhibit Appearance-Harvard, #35 Exhibit Appearance-McKesson, #36 Exhibit Appearance-Cardinal, #37 Exhibit Mot for Extension, #38 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Ext, #39 Exhibit Motion-Special Appearance, #40 Exhibit Mot for Extension, #41 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Extension, #42 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Extension, #43 Exhibit Special Appearance and Mot for Extension, #44 Exhibit LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 11/25/2020 (llg).
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3400928. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Jackson County, case number CJ-20-91 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Service of Process Documents, #2 Exhibit 2- State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Summons to Cephalon Inc, #5 Exhibit 5- Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #6 Exhibit 6- Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #7 Exhibit 7- Summons to Johnson and Johnson, #8 Exhibit 8- Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #9 Exhibit 9- Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #10 Exhibit 10- Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 11- Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 12- Summons to Allergan PLC, #13 Exhibit 13- Summons to Actavis PLC, #14 Exhibit 14- Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15- Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #16 Exhibit 16- Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #17 Exhibit 17- Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #18 Exhibit 18- Summons to Actavis LLC, #19 Exhibit 19- Summons to McKesson Corp, #20 Exhibit 20- Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #21 Exhibit 21- Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 22- Summons to Anda Inc, #23 Exhibit 23- Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24- Summons to Morris and Dickson Co LLC, #25 Exhibit 25- Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #26 Exhibit 26- Summons to The Harvard Drug Group LLC, #27 Exhibit 27- Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #28 Exhibit 28- Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #29 Exhibit 29- Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 30- Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance dba Walgreen Co, #31 Exhibit 31- Summons to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #32 Exhibit 32- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest, #33 Exhibit 33- Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Quest, #34 Exhibit 34- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson, #35 Exhibit 35- Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by McKesson et al, #36 Exhibit 36- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal, #37 Exhibit 37- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvar, #38 Exhibit 38- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by McKesson et al, #39 Exhibit 39- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Quest, #40 Exhibit 40 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by CVS et al, #41 Exhibit 41- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by CVS et al, #42 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altus City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activas PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: Elliot P Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altus City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?