Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc v. Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Plaintiff: Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01182
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 09:15 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (md)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. . (Bethea, Kenyatta)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordyn L Cartmell on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Cartmell, Jordyn)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam Engel on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Engel, Adam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bethea, Kenyatta)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of All Defendants (Bethea, Kenyatta)
November 23, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3397558. (Bethea, Kenyatta)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5158 filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Engel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Church Mutual, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Cole, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet from State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc v. Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc
Represented By: Adam Engel
Represented By: Jordyn L Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?