Aramark Services Inc et al v. 7725 Reno #1 LLC
Plaintiff: Aramark Srvices Inc and Aramark Services Inc
Defendant: 7725 Reno #1 LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01214
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Aramark Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Swichar, Jonathan)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremiah L Buettner on behalf of 7725 Reno #1 LLC (Buettner, Jeremiah)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand With Brief in Support by Aramark Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Email)(Rupert, Kurt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim with Brief in Support by Aramark Services Inc. (Rupert, Kurt)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by William Shotzbarger on behalf of Aramark Services Inc (Shotzbarger, William)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley Wasser on behalf of Aramark Services Inc (Wasser, Bradley)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan L Swichar on behalf of Aramark Services Inc (Swichar, Jonathan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Elke C Meeus on behalf of 7725 Reno #1 LLC (Meeus, Elke)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; William Shotzbarger is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Aramark Services, Inc., provided counsel submit an ECF registration form and file an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 1/7/2021. (ks)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by 7725 Reno #1 LLC . (Plourde, Ross)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Shotzbarger Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3508741 by Aramark Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Shotzbarger)(Rupert, Kurt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 FEBRUARY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:10 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 1/26/2021. (ks)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Ross A Plourde on behalf of 7725 Reno #1 LLC (Plourde, Ross)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(Plourde, Ross)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Jonathan Lawrence Swichar and Bradley Andrew Wasser are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of plaintiff Aramark Services, Inc., provided counsel submit an ECF registration form and file an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/7/2020. (ks)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3429498 by Aramark Srvices Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Request for Admission)(Rupert, Kurt)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3429432 by Aramark Srvices Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Swichar Request for Admission)(Rupert, Kurt)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aramark Srvices Inc . (Rupert, Kurt)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles E Geister, III on behalf of Aramark Srvices Inc (Geister, Charles)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kurt M Rupert on behalf of Aramark Srvices Inc (Rupert, Kurt)
December 3, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3426093. (Rupert, Kurt)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to 7725 Reno #1 LLC. (dtb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 7725 Reno #1 LLC filed by Aramark Srvices Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2- 5/6/20 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3- 8/12/20 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aramark Services Inc et al v. 7725 Reno #1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7725 Reno #1 LLC
Represented By: Elke C Meeus
Represented By: Ross A Plourde
Represented By: Jeremiah L Buettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Srvices Inc
Represented By: Kurt M Rupert
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Benton T Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Services Inc
Represented By: Kurt M Rupert
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Benton T Wheatley
Represented By: William Shotzbarger
Represented By: Jonathan L Swichar
Represented By: Bradley Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?