Reserve National Insurance Company v. American Select Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Reserve National Insurance Company
Defendant: American Select Partners LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as American Select Partners Insurance Agency and Garrett Johnson
Case Number: 5:2020cv01218
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell D Blackburn on behalf of American Select Partners LLC, Garrett Johnson (Blackburn, Mitchell)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by David R Cordell on behalf of American Select Partners LLC, Garrett Johnson (Cordell, David)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by American Select Partners, LLC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/13/2021. (mb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Disclosure Statement - LLC filed by All Defendants. (Gameros, Charles)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Defendants . (Gameros, Charles)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #9 Disclosure Statement - LLC by Reserve National Insurance Company. (Kemp, Brandon)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by American Select Partners LLC . (Gameros, Charles)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Gameros, Charles)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles W Gameros, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Gameros, Charles)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reserve National Insurance Company. Garrett Johnson served on 12/8/2020. (Kemp, Brandon)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Reserve National Insurance Company . (Kemp, Brandon)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon D Kemp on behalf of Reserve National Insurance Company (Kemp, Brandon)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor F Albert on behalf of Reserve National Insurance Company (Albert, Victor)
December 4, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3428430. (Kemp, Brandon)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Select Partners LLC, Garrett Johnson. (kmt)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Select Partners LLC, Garrett Johnson filed by Reserve National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Producer Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Commission Advance Addendum, #3 Exhibit 3 - Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Commission Schedule, #5 Exhibit 5 - Garrett Johnson 6.5.20, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reserve National Insurance Company v. American Select Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve National Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Brandon D Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Select Partners LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as American Select Partners Insurance Agency
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Represented By: David R Cordell
Represented By: Charles W Gameros, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Johnson
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Represented By: David R Cordell
Represented By: Charles W Gameros, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?