BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. S.O. Trucking Inc
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: S.O. Trucking Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01222
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. S.O. Trucking Inc served on 12/28/2020. (Haney, James)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Rainey on behalf of S.O. Trucking Inc (Rainey, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph C Schubert on behalf of S.O. Trucking Inc (Schubert, Joseph)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to S.O. Trucking Inc. (dtb)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S.O. Trucking Inc filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Loan and Security Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. S.O. Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.O. Trucking Inc
Represented By: Joseph C Schubert
Represented By: Robert L Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James K Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?