Stanley Coolahan v. John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Angela Stanley Coolahan
Defendant: John Doe, Sam's East Inc doing business as Sam's Club and Wal-Mart Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 5:2020cv01237
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days; Motions to amend due within 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 06/21/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 07/05/2021; Dft witness list due 14 days therafter; Pla exhibit list due 07/05/2021; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 10/04/2021; Jury instructions due 10/04/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/04/2021; Trial briefs due 10/04/2021; Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Report due by 10/4/2021. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/05/2021. (jb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Angela Stanley Coolahan. (Kelliher, Chad)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2021 11:20 AM telephonically before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 1/27/2021. (jb) Modified on 1/5/2021 to correct time(jb).
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc.(Brewer, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Harrison C Lujan on behalf of Angela Stanley Coolahan (Lujan, Harrison)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob L Rowe on behalf of Angela Stanley Coolahan (Rowe, Jacob)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Simone Gosnell Fulmer on behalf of Angela Stanley Coolahan (Fulmer, Simone)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Peyton S Howell on behalf of Angela Stanley Coolahan (Howell, Peyton)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Chad W P Kelliher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelliher, Chad)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea R Rust on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rust, Andrea)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc (Scott, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc . (Brewer, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc. (Brewer, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc (Brewer, Michael)
December 9, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3440992. (Brewer, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2020-976 filed by Wal-Mart Inc, Sam's East Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley Coolahan v. John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stanley Coolahan
Represented By: Chad W P Kelliher
Represented By: Andrea R Rust
Represented By: Peyton S Howell
Represented By: Jacob L Rowe
Represented By: Simone Gosnell Fulmer
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Simone Fulmer Gaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?