Modern Forge Indiana LLC v. Emkade Distribution USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Modern Forge Indiana LLC
Defendant: Emkade Distribution USA Inc and Emkade Distribution Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01241
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emkade Distribution Inc, Emkade Distribution USA Inc filed by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders & Invoices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Accounts Receivable, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter)(Pittman, Brock)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Modern Forge Indiana LLC, #7 12/11/2020 Order. Plf is given leave to file a second amended complaint DUE within 14 days of the date of this order. The second amended complaint must either allege all missing jurisdictional information identified by the court in its orders or state plf's reasons for its inability to do so. If, after reviewing the court's orders, plf is confused about what information must be alleged in support of diversity jurisdiction, plf may move for clarification, identifying which of the court's directives plf finds unclear. Absent compliance with the court's orders, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/11/2021. (llg)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Modern Forge Indiana LLC Amended. (Pittman, Brock)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emkade Distribution Inc, Emkade Distribution USA Inc filed by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders & Invoices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Accounts Receivable, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter)(Pittman, Brock)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Derrick Thompson, Jr on behalf of Modern Forge Indiana LLC (Thompson, Derrick)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The plaintiff shall file its first amended Complaint no later than January 8, 2021. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/28/2020. (dtb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #7 Order, by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. (Pittman, Brock) Modified on 12/29/2020 (llg).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, provided that Derrick M. Thompson, Jr. submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/22/2020. (llg)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3473397 by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Pittman, Brock)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of the date of this order, a first amended complaint which provides the missing jurisdictional information identified in this order. Absent compliance, this action may be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/11/2020. (llg)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by J Clay Christensen on behalf of Modern Forge Indiana LLC (Christensen, J)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Miles on behalf of Modern Forge Indiana LLC (Miles, Jonathan)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Modern Forge Indiana LLC . (Pittman, Brock)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock Z Pittman on behalf of Modern Forge Indiana LLC (Pittman, Brock)
December 10, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3444827. (Pittman, Brock)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Emkade Distribution Inc, Emkade Distribution USA Inc. (dtb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emkade Distribution Inc, Emkade Distribution USA Inc filed by Modern Forge Indiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Purchase Orders and Invoices, #2 Exhibit 2- Statement of Account, #3 Exhibit 3- Demand Letter Dated 10-13-20, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Forge Indiana LLC v. Emkade Distribution USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emkade Distribution USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emkade Distribution Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Forge Indiana LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M Miles
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Brock Z Pittman
Represented By: Derrick M Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?