National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford v. TCI International Inc et al
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Defendant: WTI Holdings LLC, Arcosa Marine Components LLC, Does 1-10, Wintech International LLC and TCI International Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01264
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 45 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/12/2022. (mb)
June 29, 2022 Filing 54 REPLY by Defendant TCI International Inc re #50 Response in Opposition to Motion, #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by TCI International Inc. (Shu, Glen)
June 27, 2022 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support - Declaration of Daniel Rapp filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Campbell, Bryan)
June 27, 2022 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support - Declaration of Kelley Smith filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
June 27, 2022 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support - Declaration of Bryan Campbell filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Campbell, Bryan)
June 27, 2022 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
June 23, 2022 Filing 49 REPLY by Defendant TCI International Inc re #45 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Rapp filed by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shu, Glen)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant WTI Holdings, LLC. filed by Heath W. Garwood. Attorney Heath W Garwood terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/21/2022. (kmt)
June 21, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WTI Holdings LLC. (Garwood, Heath)
June 16, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford re #45 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Rapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Campbell, Bryan)
June 16, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Rapp and Memorandum in Support filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Joint Motion to Continue Trial and All PendingDeadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/7/2022. (mb)
June 6, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Rapp and Memorandum in Support by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Shu, Glen)
June 6, 2022 Filing 42 JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial and All Pending Deadlines by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
June 6, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Shu, Glen)
June 1, 2022 Filing 40 OBJECTIONS re #33 Exhibit List / Witness List filed by WTI Holdings LLC. (Felty, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Filing 39 Exhibit List / Witness List by Defendant WTI Holdings LLC. (Felty, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS re #33 Exhibit List / Witness List filed by TCI International Inc. (Shu, Glen)
June 1, 2022 Filing 37 Exhibit List / Witness List by Defendant TCI International Inc. (Shu, Glen)
June 1, 2022 Filing 36 Expert Witness List Rebuttal by Plaintiff National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 35 Expert Witness List by Defendant WTI Holdings LLC. (Felty, Michael)
May 18, 2022 Filing 34 Expert Witness List by Defendant TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shu, Glen)
May 18, 2022 Filing 33 Exhibit List / Witness List by Plaintiff National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
May 4, 2022 Filing 32 Expert Witness List Disclosure of Expert Testimony by Plaintiff National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Campbell, Bryan)
December 9, 2021 Jury Trial terminated (mb)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Joint Motion to Continue Trial and All PendingDeadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/9/2021. (mb)
December 9, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/5/2022. Motions due by 6/6/2022. Pretrial Report due by 8/2/2022. (mb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 30 JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial and All Pending Deadlines by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Goolsby, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/7/2021. (mb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shu, Glen)
September 22, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Subpoena by WTI Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Long Wave Services, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Long Wave, Inc.)(Felty, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE (other) by WTI Holdings LLC re #25 Notice of Subpoena of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Felty, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Subpoena by WTI Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Long Wave Services, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Long Wave, Inc.)(Felty, Michael)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 1/4/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 1/18/2022; Pla witness list due 1/18/2022; Pla exhibit list due 1/18/2022; Stipulations due 4/4/2022; Motions in limine due 4/4/2022; Jury instructions due 4/4/2022; Voir dire requests due 4/4/2022; Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 2/4/2022. Pretrial Report due by 4/4/2022.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/2/2021. (mb)
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Goolsby, Robert)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/22/2021. (mb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Arcosa Marine Components, LLC only by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Goolsby, Robert)
February 2, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan R Campbell on behalf of National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Campbell, Bryan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 19 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2021 03:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 2/25/2021. (mb)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T Goolsby on behalf of National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Goolsby, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan Campbell. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/20/2021. (mb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory Ulmer on behalf of TCI International Inc (Ulmer, Gregory)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Glen Shu on behalf of TCI International Inc (Shu, Glen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan Campbell Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3536928 by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission)(Goolsby, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford . (Goolsby, Robert)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Gregory Clayton Ulmer's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/29/20. (kmt)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Peng-Cheng Glen Shu's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/29/20. (kmt)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Clayton Ulmer Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3485696 by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Gregory Ulmer Request for Admission)(McKinstry, Toby)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peng-Cheng Glen Shu Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3485686 by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Glen Shu Request for Admission)(McKinstry, Toby)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TCI International Inc. (McKinstry, Toby)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by WTI Holdings LLC.(Felty, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael C Felty on behalf of WTI Holdings LLC (Felty, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Heath W Garwood on behalf of WTI Holdings LLC (Garwood, Heath)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by TCI International Inc.(McKinstry, Toby)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TCI International Inc . (McKinstry, Toby)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Toby M McKinstry on behalf of TCI International Inc (McKinstry, Toby)
December 18, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3467372. (McKinstry, Toby)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3898 filed by TCI International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - TCI Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - WTI Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford v. TCI International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTI Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael C Felty
Represented By: Heath W Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcosa Marine Components LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintech International LLC
Represented By: Michael C Felty
Represented By: Heath W Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCI International Inc
Represented By: Toby M McKinstry
Represented By: Glen Shu
Represented By: Gregory C Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Robert T Goolsby
Represented By: Bryan R Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?