Ladd LLC v. Marathon Oil Company
Plaintiff: Ladd LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Marathon Oil Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Ronald Sykes, Dwayne Benson Pavon, Norma Jean Sykes, Harvey J Sykes, Rebecca Zschach, Tonya Ross, Chelsea Lietzke, James T Sykes and Crystal Ross
Case Number: 5:2020cv01268
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Brady L Smith on behalf of Chelsea Lietzke, Crystal Ross, Tonya Ross, Rebecca Zschach (Smith, Brady)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Third-Party Plaintiff, Marathon Oil Company's Third-Party Complaint. Response due on or before March 2, 2021. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/29/21. (jw)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Chelsea Lietzke, Crystal Ross, Tonya Ross, Rebecca Zschach. (Albert, John)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion or Other Pleading in Response to Marathon's Counterclaim. LADD shall file its answer, motion or other pleading in response to Marathons Counterclaim [Doc. 7] on or before March 2, 2021. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/28/21. (jw)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Ladd LLC. (Albert, John)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John P Albert on behalf of Chelsea Lietzke, Crystal Ross, Tonya Ross, Rebecca Zschach (Albert, John)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chelsea Lietzke, Dwayne Benson Pavon, Crystal Ross, Tonya Ross, Ronald Sykes, Rebecca Zschach. (kmt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Marathon Oil Company . (Brown, L)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against NORMA JEAN SYKES, HARVEY J SYKES, TONYA ROSS, JAMES T SYKES, RONALD SYKES, CHELSEA LIETZKE, DWAYNE BENSON PAVON, CRYSTAL ROSS, REBECCA ZSCHACH, COUNTERCLAIM against Ladd LLC by Marathon Oil Company.(Brown, L)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by L Vance Brown on behalf of Marathon Oil Company (Brown, L)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Ladd LLC . (Smith, Brady)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John P Albert on behalf of Ladd LLC (Albert, John)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brady L Smith on behalf of Ladd LLC (Smith, Brady)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Marathon Oil Company. (kmt)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marathon Oil Company filed by Ladd LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Marathon)(kmt)
December 21, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3471245. (Smith, Brady)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladd LLC v. Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: L Vance Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladd LLC
Represented By: Brady L Smith
Represented By: John P Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ronald Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dwayne Benson Pavon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Norma Jean Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Harvey J Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rebecca Zschach
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Brady L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tonya Ross
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Brady L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chelsea Lietzke
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Brady L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James T Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Crystal Ross
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Brady L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?