Smith et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Guzman and Devon Smith
Defendant: General Motors LLC and TRW Automotive Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00016
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Over ZF Automotive US Inc. and Its Relevant Subsidiaries with Brief in Support filed by TRW Automotive Inc. (Huckaby, Christian)
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Over ZF Automotive US Inc. and Its Relevant Subsidiaries with Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of William Paul Munsell, Jr. PE, #2 Exhibit Photographs of Seatbelt)(Denney, Richard)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #13 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss filed by TRW Automotive Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Name Change)(Huckaby, Christian)
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ZF Next Generation Mobility, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of William Paul Munsell, Jr., P.E., #3 Exhibit TRW - The Global Safety Standard 2010 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit List of Ford Dealerships, #5 Exhibit List of GM Dealerships, #6 Exhibit Oklahoma Secretary of State Entity Summary Information re Ford Motor Company, #7 Exhibit Oklahoma Secretary of State Search Corporation Entities re General Motors Corporation, #8 Exhibit Brockman v. American Honda Motor Co. (Colo. Case No. 2015CV32157 Feb. 1, 2016), #9 Exhibit Mayo v. General Motors, LLC, et al. (U.S.D.C. Colo. Case No. 15-CV-01418-RBJ July 26, 2016))(Denney, Richard)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L Bell on behalf of General Motors LLC (Bell, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss by TRW Automotive Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Ameen Order, #5 Exhibit Mills Order)(Huckaby, Christian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TRW Automotive Inc . (Huckaby, Christian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TRW Automotive Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Ameen Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Mills Order)(Huckaby, Christian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Christian S Huckaby on behalf of TRW Automotive Inc (Huckaby, Christian)
January 18, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford G Hooper on behalf of General Motors LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason E Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robinson, Jason)
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lydia J Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barrett, Lydia)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard L Denney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denney, Richard)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by General Motors LLC . (Kaufmann, Linda) Modified on 1/11/20 to correct filing error. (knt)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Kaufmann, Linda)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of General Motors LLC (Kaufmann, Linda)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of General Motors LLC (Teague, J)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2020-4603 filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint 09/29/20, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Consent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proofs of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
January 11, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3520011. (Teague, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Guzman
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Smith
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Sanford G Hooper
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Michael L Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive Inc
Represented By: Christian S Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?