Lyles et al v. American Bank Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Larry Lyles
Defendant: American Bank Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00023
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 in 5:20-cv-01307-G MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel and Brief in Support filed by Tracy McPherson and granting #26 in 5:21-cv-00023-G MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Opening Brief in Support filed by Larry Lyles. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2021. (jb)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2021. (jb)
March 11, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Charles Goodwin: Status Conference held on 3/11/2021. (Court Reporter Susan Fenimore.) (jb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Larry Lyles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Rule 26f Report and Discovery Plan)(Lynch, Gary)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. This case is set for a Status and Scheduling Conference on Thursday, March 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 305 of the William J. Holloway Jr. United States Courthouse. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan by Monday, March 8, 2021. Counsel shall be prepared to argue the merits of Plaintiff's Motion for Consolidation of Two Actions. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/01/2021. (jb)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 20, 2021. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/18/2021. (jb)
February 16, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by American Bank Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCarron, Claudia)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Claudia D McCarron on behalf of American Bank Systems Inc (McCarron, Claudia)
February 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Opening Brief in Support by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). (Federman, William)
February 2, 2021 Filing 25 CORRECTED ORDER. Ms. McCarron shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 11, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. This order supersedes Court's order entered on January 29, 2021 (Doc. No. #21 ). Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/02/2021. (jb)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Bank Systems Inc . (Sweet, Kyle)
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). American Bank Systems Inc served on 1/29/2021. (Federman, William)
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Molly Brantley on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Brantley, Molly)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. McCarron shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 11, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/29/2021. (jb)
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Claudia D. McCarron Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3565805 by American Bank Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sweet, Kyle)
January 25, 2021 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas A Colella on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Colella, Nicholas)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamisen A Etzel on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Etzel, Jamisen)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly K Iverson on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Iverson, Kelly)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Gary F Lynch on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Lynch, Gary)
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian D Blackstock on behalf of American Bank Systems Inc (Blackstock, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Colella shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 2, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/20/2021. (jb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Etzel shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 2, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/20/2021. (jb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Iverson shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 2, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/20/2021. (jb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Lynch shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before February 2, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/20/2021. (jb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle N Sweet on behalf of American Bank Systems Inc (Sweet, Kyle)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case...for future filings in this case the letters at the end of the case number should now be "G". Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/15/2021. (lam)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly K. Iverson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3525937 by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request Pro Hac Vice)(Federman, William)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas A. Colella Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3525934 by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request Pro Hac Vice)(Federman, William)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jamisen A. Etzel Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3525920 by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request Pro Hac Vice)(Federman, William)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary F. Lynch Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3525919 by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request Pro Hac Vice)(Federman, William)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler James Bean on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Bean, Tyler)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself) (Federman, William)
January 12, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3522283. (Federman, William)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Bank Systems Inc. (knt)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Bank Systems Inc filed by Larry Lyles(on behalf of himself), Larry Lyles(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyles et al v. American Bank Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lyles
Represented By: Tyler J Bean
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Molly E Brantley
Represented By: Tyler James Bean
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Nicholas A Colella
Represented By: Jamisen A Etzel
Represented By: Molly Brantley
Represented By: Kelly K Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bank Systems Inc
Represented By: Claudia D McCarron
Represented By: Kyle N Sweet
Represented By: Brian D Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?