Brock v. Crow
Petitioner: Aaron Thomas Brock
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow and Mark Gentry
Case Number: 5:2021cv00036
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The due date for Respondent's Response is extended and set to be due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 2/26/2021. (mc)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Scott Crow. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Hunt, Caroline)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline EJ Hunt on behalf of Scott Crow (Hunt, Caroline)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR RESPONSE BY OKLAHOMA ATTORNEY GENERAL TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254 -- The Respondent shall file a response to the allegations of the Petition within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/26/2021. (mc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 1/19/21. (kmt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/19/21. (kmt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:20-cv-00460.
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Substituting Scott Crow, DOC Director, as the respondent in this case. Because Petitioner is incarcerated at a private prison, the DOC Director is his custodian. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Aaron Thomas Brock, Petitioner, v. Scott Crow, DOC Director, Respondent.(acg, Deputy Clerk)[Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Aaron Thomas Brock (With attachments) (Gifford, Robert) Modified on 12/28/2020 to term motion and edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 16, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/16/2020 in the amount of $5, receipt number AOKEDC-1437985 (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Aaron Thomas Brock (Gifford, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Denying Petitioner's motion to compel response to petition #6 . The Court will enter an order for Respondent to respond to the petition after Petitioner has paid the filing fee #7 . (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Initial Filing Fee due by 1/7/2021(acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Response by the Oklahoma Attorney General or the Oklahoma County District Attorney's Office to Petition for Habeas Corpus by Aaron Thomas Brock Responses due by 12/28/2020(Gifford, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-20-460-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Aaron Thomas Brock (With attachments) Responses due by 12/28/2020(Gifford, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Don Gifford on behalf of Aaron Thomas Brock (Gifford, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Aaron Thomas Brock (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Aaron Thomas Brock (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock v. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Represented By: Caroline EJ Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Thomas Brock
Represented By: Robert Don Gifford
Represented By: Robert D Gifford, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?