First Mortgage Company LLC v. Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: First Mortgage Company LLC
Defendant: Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC, Jim Cameron and Jeff Babcock
Case Number: 5:2021cv00047
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw Proposition III of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 03/19/2021. (cr)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw #15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Proposition III ONLY) by All Defendants. (McDevitt, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC. (kmt)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cameron Declaration)(Chubbuck, Stacey)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card, #2 Exhibit Endorsed Summons, #3 Exhibit USPS E-Tracker)(Leibrock, Fred)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss as moot in light of filing of Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/22/21. (cr)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeff Babcock, Jim Cameron, Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC filed by First Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Engagement Letter)(Leibrock, Fred)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Mortgage Company LLC. Jeff Babcock served on 1/11/2021; Jim Cameron served on 1/12/2021; Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC served on 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Endorsed Summons - Babcock, #3 Exhibit Endorsed Summons - Cameron, #4 Exhibit Endorsed Summons - Stratmor)(Leibrock, Fred)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Stacey S Chubbuck on behalf of All Defendants (Chubbuck, Stacey)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J G McDevitt on behalf of All Defendants (McDevitt, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC . (McDevitt, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC . (McDevitt, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2019 Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2019 Petition, #3 Exhibit Cameron Declaration, #4 Exhibit Babcock Declaration, #5 Exhibit Summons and Petition Mailed to Babcock, #6 Exhibit Summons and Petition Mailed to Cameron, #7 Exhibit Georgia Secretary of State Information)(McDevitt, Matthew)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin G Bates on behalf of First Mortgage Company LLC (Bates, Justin)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by First Mortgage Company LLC . (Leibrock, Fred)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Fred A Leibrock on behalf of First Mortgage Company LLC (Leibrock, Fred)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number OKW500083745 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (dtb)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3730 filed by Jim Cameron, Jeff Babcock, Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to Jim Cameron, #3 Exhibit 3 - Third Party Complaint, SDNY, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cameron Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Leibrock EOA, #7 Exhibit 7 - Proposed Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Mortgage Company LLC v. Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Mortgage Finance Group LLC
Represented By: Stacey S Chubbuck
Represented By: Matthew J G McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cameron
Represented By: Stacey S Chubbuck
Represented By: Matthew J G McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Babcock
Represented By: Stacey S Chubbuck
Represented By: Matthew J G McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Mortgage Company LLC
Represented By: Fred A Leibrock
Represented By: Cody J Cooper
Represented By: Robert O O'Bannon
Represented By: Justin G Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?