Amason v. Riverside Transportation Inc et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Amason
Defendant: Christopher Himmelshach, Riverside Transportation Inc and Christopher J Himmelsbach
Case Number: 5:2021cv00069
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case. The clerk of court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/01/2021. (knt)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Transfer Case by Curtis Amason. (Allred, Raymond)
April 1, 2021 Docket Annotation: Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma. (knt)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 defendant's motion to dismiss and the direct negligence claims against Riverside are Dismissed...plaintiff is granted leave to amend within 14 days to remedy the pleading deficiencies if he can do so. Further within that same period plaintiff is directed to show cause by an appropriate pleading why this case should not be transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma where the situs of the accident is located and where presumably evidence as to the accident is more likely to be found. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/24/2021. (lam)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Reissued Electronically - Alias as to Defendant Christopher J Himmelsbach. (knt)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Riverside Transportation Inc. (Hancock, Nicholaus)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Curtis Amason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Allred, Raymond)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Curtis Amason.(Allred, Raymond)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Riverside Transportation Inc. (Coffey, Robert)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholaus A Hancock on behalf of Riverside Transportation Inc (Hancock, Nicholaus)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert P Coffey, Jr on behalf of Riverside Transportation Inc (Coffey, Robert)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Curtis Amason.(Allred, Raymond)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Riverside Transportation, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiff Curtis Amason. (Allred, Raymond)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Colton L Richardson on behalf of Curtis Amason (Richardson, Colton)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond S Allred on behalf of Curtis Amason (Allred, Raymond)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 02/04/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/01/2021. (lam)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Himmelshach, Riverside Transportation Inc. (knt)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Himmelshach, Riverside Transportation Inc filed by Curtis Amason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
February 1, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3572112. (Allred, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amason v. Riverside Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Amason
Represented By: Raymond S Allred
Represented By: Colton L Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Himmelshach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Transportation Inc
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Represented By: Nicholaus A Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J Himmelsbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?