Gude v. Baclawski et al
Plaintiff: Valeria J Gude
Defendant: Waldemar Baclawski and Sub-Zero Logistics Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00182
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER In accordance with the Order entered contemporaneously herewith, the following deadlines are set by the Court: Motions to join due 4/22/2021; Motions to amend due 4/22/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 7/1/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 7/15/2021; Pla witness list due 7/1/2021; Dft witness list due 7/15/2021; Pla exhibit list due 7/21/2021; Dft exhibit list due 7/28/2021; Stipulations due 9/1/2021; Motions in limine due 9/1/2021; Jury instructions due 9/1/2021; Voir dire requests due 9/1/2021; Trial briefs due 9/1/2021; Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Report due by 9/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 4/1/2021. (md)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 4/1/2021. (md)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings /Amend Scheduling Order by Waldemar Baclawski, Sub-Zero Logistics Inc. (Thul, Ashley)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Before the Court is the parties Joint Status Report [Doc. No. 17]. Upon review, the Court finds a Status/Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The Court enters the following Scheduling Order: Motions to join due 4/22/2021; Motions to amend due 4/22/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/2/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 8/16/2021; Pla witness list due 8/2/2021; Dft witness list due 8/16/2021; Pla exhibit list due 8/23/2021; Dft exhibit list due 8/30/2021; Stipulations due 10/1/2021; Motions in limine due 10/1/2021; Jury instructions due 10/1/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/1/2021; Trial briefs due 10/1/2021; Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 9/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/23/2021. (md)
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Valeria J Gude. (Keogh, Greg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sub-Zero Logistics Inc . (Thul, Ashley)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan D Rex on behalf of Valeria J Gude (Rex, Nathan)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg S Keogh on behalf of Valeria J Gude (Keogh, Greg)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 EMAIL from Courtroom Deputy Marcia J. Davis to Oklahoma State Attorney General.(md)(Entered 03/09/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION The Court certifies to the Oklahoma Attorney General that the constitutionality of Okla. Stat. tit. 23, 9.1 has been questioned by Defendant in this action. Pursuant to Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Attorney General may intervene within 60 days after the filing of Defendants Notice, or by May 4, 2021. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Certification to the Oklahoma Attorney General either by certified or registered mail or by transmission to an electronic address designated by the Attorney General for this purpose. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/9/2021. (md)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Waldemar Baclawski.(Thul, Ashley)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Application for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. Defendant Waldemar Baclawski is granted leave to file his Answer out of time on or before March 15, 2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/8/2021. (md)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Waldemar Baclawski (Ottaway, Larry)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) by Waldemar Baclawski Consent to Removal (Thul, Ashley)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Waldemar Baclawski. (Thul, Ashley)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley M Thul on behalf of Waldemar Baclawski (Thul, Ashley)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Sub-Zero Logistics Inc (Ottaway, Larry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Sub-Zero Logistics Inc of Constitutional Question (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer of Sub-Zero)(Thul, Ashley)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sub-Zero Logistics Inc.(Thul, Ashley)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley M Thul on behalf of Sub-Zero Logistics Inc (Thul, Ashley)
March 5, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3636797. (Thul, Ashley)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-21-415 filed by Sub-Zero Logistics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to the Sub-Zero, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSCN Case Details, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA of Rex for Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA of Keogh for Plaintiff, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gude v. Baclawski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria J Gude
Represented By: Greg S Keogh
Represented By: Nathan D Rex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldemar Baclawski
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sub-Zero Logistics Inc
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?