Burckhalter et al v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benji Adam Burckhalter and April Michelle Burckhalter
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Ballard's of Clinton Inc an Oklahoma Domestic for-Profit Business Corporation doing business as McKinsey Motor Company and Michelin North America Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00239
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Michelin North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bullion, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Plaintiffs Agreed Motion for Continuance and to Amendthe Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/10/2021. (mb)
November 10, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/28/2022. Motions due by 7/28/2022. Pretrial Report due by 9/29/2022. (mb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Continue by April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter. (Ladd, Jessica)
September 24, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
September 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
July 9, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 30 days; Motions to amend due 30 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 11/30/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 1/31/2022; Pla witness list due 1/31/2022; Dft witness list due 2/14/2022; Pla exhibit list due 1/31/2022; Dft exhibit list due 2/14/2022; Motions in limine due 7/1/2022; Jury instructions due 7/11/2022; Voir dire requests due 7/11/2022; Discovery due by 3/30/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 4/29/2022. Pretrial Report due by 7/1/2022.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/2/2021. (mb) Modified on 6/2/2021 (mb).
June 1, 2021 Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff April Michelle Burckhalter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Scheduling Order)(Santos, Ernesto)
May 27, 2021 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Ernesto L Santos, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Santos, Ernesto)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/24/2021. (mb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 01:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 6/1/2021. (mb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica S Ladd on behalf of April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter (Ladd, Jessica)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ernesto Luis Santos, Jr.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/27/2021. (mb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Chris A Blackerby on behalf of Michelin North America Inc (Blackerby, Chris)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas Monroe Bullion, III on behalf of Michelin North America Inc (Bullion, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 21 Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW50008580 regarding #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kmt)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter (Branum, John)
April 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ladd, Jessica)
April 14, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica S Ladd on behalf of April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter (Ladd, Jessica)
April 14, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by John L Branum on behalf of April Michelle Burckhalter, Benji Adam Burckhalter (Branum, John)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris A. Blackerby. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/12/2021. (mb)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Bullion, III. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/12/2021. (mb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3660572 by Michelin North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Request for Admission PHV)(Jennings, James)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3660509 by Michelin North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Request for Admission PHV)(Jennings, James)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Michelin North America Inc . (Kaufmann, Linda)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ballard's of Clinton Inc Ballard's of Clinton dba McKinsey Motor Company. (Prosser, Dru)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ford Motor Company . (Prosser, Dru)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE (other) by Michelin North America Inc Consent to Removal (Kaufmann, Linda)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of Michelin North America Inc (Kaufmann, Linda)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James A Jennings, III on behalf of Michelin North America Inc (Jennings, James)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition and Brief in Support by Ballard's of Clinton Inc. (Richardson, Andrew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company.(Richardson, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Dru A Prosser on behalf of Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of Ballard's of Clinton Inc, Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3649726. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-606 filed by Ford Motor Company, Ballard's of Clinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oklahoma County Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oklahoma County Filings, #4 Exhibit 4 - March 21, 2021 Email, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burckhalter et al v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benji Adam Burckhalter
Represented By: Jay M Mitchel
Represented By: Jessica S Ladd
Represented By: John L Branum
Represented By: Ernesto L Santos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Michelle Burckhalter
Represented By: Jay M Mitchel
Represented By: Jessica S Ladd
Represented By: John L Branum
Represented By: Ernesto L Santos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Dru A Prosser
Represented By: Andrew L Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard's of Clinton Inc an Oklahoma Domestic for-Profit Business Corporation doing business as McKinsey Motor Company
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Dru A Prosser
Represented By: Andrew L Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America Inc
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Thomas Monroe Bullion, III
Represented By: James A Jennings, III
Represented By: Chris A Blackerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?