Schmidt et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Schmidt and Capital First Trust Company
Defendant: Hector De Leon and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00341
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin B Weiner on behalf of General Motors LLC (Weiner, Justin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 39 E-MAIL of Acknowledgment of receipt of this Court's E-mail [Doc. No. 38] from Kindanne Jones, Deputy Attorney General - Office of the Attorney General. E-mail received on 06/09/2021 at 1:19 p.m. (nv)
June 9, 2021 Filing 38 E-MAIL to Attorney General from courtroom deputy, Nyssa Vasquez. (nv)
June 9, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION TO OKLAHOMA ATTORNEY GENERAL. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(c), the Attorney General may intervene within 60 days after the filing of Defendant's Notice, or by August 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/09/2021. (nv)
June 9, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Hooper, Sanford)
June 9, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Unavailability (Barrett, Lydia)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin B. Weiner and granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica M. Mills. See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/08/2021. (nv)
June 8, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE (other) by General Motors LLC Constitutional Question Regarding Oklahoma's Punitive Damages Statute (Kaufmann, Linda)
June 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE (other) by General Motors LLC of Joint Stipulated Facts (Hooper, Sanford)
June 4, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica M. Mills Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3697076 by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Request for Admission PHV)(Teague, J)
June 4, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin B. Weiner Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3697060 by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Request for Admission PHV)(Teague, J)
June 2, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Subpoena by General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Subpoena EMSA, #2 Exhibit 2: Subpoena Geico, #3 Exhibit 3: Subpoena OKC FD, #4 Exhibit 4: Subpoena OKC PD)(Kaufmann, Linda)
June 2, 2021 Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Based on the parties' submissions and agreements, and under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c), the Court enters the following proposed protective order to the Notice [Doc. No. #27 -1]. The Court denies the Motion for Protective Order [Doc. No. #20 ] as moot. See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/02/2021. (knt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE (other) by General Motors LLC of Status Regarding Protective Order and Production of Documents Referenced in Initial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Sanford)
June 1, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Langford, Lauren)
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by M. Wesley Smithart on behalf of General Motors LLC (Smithart, M.)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 3/17/2023. Motions due by 3/24/2023. Pretrial Report due by 4/28/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2023 before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. See Scheduling Order for all deadlines. Signed by the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 05/26/2021. (knt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Robinson, Jason)
May 25, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman: Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2021. See Minute Entry for deadlines. Scheduling Order to follow. (knt)
May 24, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by William J Molinsky, Jr on behalf of Hector De Leon (Molinsky, William)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GM's proposed order, #2 Exhibit Robinson email, #3 Exhibit Zimmerman affidavit)(Hooper, Sanford)
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Capital First Trust Company, Jordan Schmidt, Jordan Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Scheduling Order)(Robinson, Jason)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joel Chandler Bailey, II on behalf of General Motors LLC (Bailey, Joel)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel must register to e-file with this Court and electronically file an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.2(g) and LCvR83.4. Counsel must follow the local rules of this Court, including but not limited to immediate disclosures to the Court of any suspension, disbarment, or resignation that triggers the application of LCvR83.6(a). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 05/11/2021. (knt)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Margaret Wesley Smithart Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3681583 by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Request for Admission PHV)(Teague, J)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel Chandler Bailey Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3681577 by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Request for Admission PHV)(Teague, J)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Capital First Trust Company . (Langford, Lauren)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff Capital First Trust Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. This Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff Capital First Trust Company to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms." Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 04/27/2021. (nv)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL SCHEDULING/STATUS CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due 5/17/2021. (knt)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Monty L Cain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cain, Monty)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M Langford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langford, Lauren)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE re: receipt of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (Kaufmann, Linda)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason E Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robinson, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard L Denney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denney, Richard)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L Bell on behalf of General Motors LLC (Bell, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford G Hooper on behalf of General Motors LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by General Motors LLC . (Kaufmann, Linda)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of General Motors LLC (Kaufmann, Linda)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of General Motors LLC (Teague, J)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-902 filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Returned Summons (Hector DeLeon) 03.12.21, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA Def DeLeon 03.16.21, #5 Exhibit 5 - Returned Summons (GM) 03.22.21, #6 Exhibit 6 - DeLeon Answer 03.23.21, #7 Exhibit 7 - EOA (JDT LGK) 04.05.21, #8 Exhibit 8 - EOA (MLB SGH) 04.05.21, #9 Exhibit 9 - GM's Answers 04.05.21, #10 Exhibit 10 - Sec of State Filing, #11 Exhibit 11 - Collision Report_Redacted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
April 15, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3664565. (Teague, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector De Leon
Represented By: William J Molinsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Sanford G Hooper
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Michael L Bell
Represented By: Justin B Weiner
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey, II
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Schmidt
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Represented By: Lauren M Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital First Trust Company
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Represented By: Lauren M Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?