Wake Energy LLC et al v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
Plaintiff: Wake Energy LLC and Wake Operating LLC
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Case Number: 5:2021cv00352
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant Devon Energy Production Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Defendant Devon Energy Production Company to file within 7 days of this order its Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, using the form available on the Courts website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wp-content/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf). (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/14/2021. (ks)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 JULY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2021 10:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 6/29/2021. (ks)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick L Stein on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Stein, Patrick)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Cole B McLanahan on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (McLanahan, Cole)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Devon Energy Production Company LP.(Bomhoff, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J Bomhoff on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Bomhoff, Timothy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Wake Operating LLC(on behalf of all others similarly situated,) Amended. (Hatfield, Lincoln)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Wake Operating LLC(on behalf of themselves) . (Hatfield, Lincoln)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Wake Energy LLC . (Hatfield, Lincoln)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Micah L Adkison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Adkison, Micah)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Verplank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Verplank, Scott)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James M Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hill, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lincoln C Hatfield on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hatfield, Lincoln)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Travis P Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Travis)
April 20, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3666883. (Brown, Travis)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Devon Energy Production Company LP. (dtb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wake Energy LLC et al v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wake Energy LLC
Represented By: Micah L Adkison
Represented By: Travis P Brown
Represented By: James M Hill
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Represented By: Lincoln C Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wake Operating LLC
Represented By: Micah L Adkison
Represented By: Travis P Brown
Represented By: James M Hill
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Represented By: Lincoln C Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Timothy J Bomhoff
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Represented By: Cole B McLanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?