Ford v. Hinsperger
Plaintiff: Eric Juan Ford
Defendant: Jennifer Hinsperger
Case Number: 5:2021cv00493
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #8 filed by Eric Juan Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report and Recommendation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request to Staff 6-17-21, #3 Exhibit 3 - Request to Staff 6-21-21, #4 Exhibit 4 - Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration in Support, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proof of Service, #7 Envelope)(kmt)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Eric Juan Ford. The undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's orders. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2021. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/24/2021. (rb)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Eric Juan Ford (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Summons (Not Issued), #2 Attachment) (kmt)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2021. (rb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 5/14/2021. (kah)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 5/14/2021. (kah)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (kah)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint by Eric Juan Ford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Hinsperger filed by Eric Juan Ford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Hinsperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Juan Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hinsperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?