National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa v. New Dominion LLC et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa
Defendant: Anthony Kralik, William Gardner, Mary H. Smith, Roland Lozier, Greg Depew, Gagelene Tyree, Jordan Hernandez, Larry Harlow, Michael Preston, Shirley Weiss, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Laura Wolf, David Ball, Kathleen Roberts, Ellen Maxwell, John Schwall, Robert Talbot, William Wood, Sherry Howard, Earl White, Meghan McGee, Keith H Finley, Ronald Campbell, Patricia Colson, Robert Williams, Darlene Travis, Megan Hodge, Kimberly Moyer, Richard Fuller, Mike Leard, Gary Puterka, Nancy R Maxey, Dolores Jackson, James E Doss, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Douglas Norman Smith, Harold Colbert, Tamara Ribera, Parvin Sadeghy, Michael Peters, Steven Dummer, Christine Leavitt, Shane Buss, Misty B Ellerby, Edwin Carr, Sharon K Bryen, Dennis Atkinson, Brad K Harber, Linda Haskell, Nancy Simpson, Ronald Thornbrue, Abbas Movlai, Julian Ash, Raelene Neighbors, Diana Pierre, James R Montgomery, III, Linda Lavender, Dale Cheatham, Shalyla Hudson, Neile Blackwell, Shannon White, Terri McCoy, Robert Caldwell, Jesse Tischauser, Shannon Harwell, Virginia Lee Maguire, Troy Crews, James L Pendley, Sr, Marieca Pilcher, Teri Newby, Lauralee Hartz, Sharon Ann Bruce, Rae Lemonier, Rebecca Harris, Nathan Buchanan, Tim Sweatte, Kristy Jaynes, Mark Helberg, Theresa McDaniel, G Terry Felts, Don Neighbors, Ediwin House, Davinna Allensworth, Shirley Coleman, Brenton Jaynes, Lisa Wolf, Christine Brewer, Julie Holbrook, Chris Gillespie, Jennifer Lin Copper, Scott Monetti, Cynthia Ward, Theresa M Kindle, David Main, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Debra Cooper, Gina Jordan, James Douglas Stafford, Leland Annesley, Shirley Sparks, David H Levan, Rona Goodeagle, Manny Torres, Americ Leeviraphan, Sherri Leard, Grace J Dotson, Donald Brewer, Christie S Chacko, Tammy B Dougherty, Lisa Griggs, Tara Tischauser, Saundra Taylor, Sherry Sappington, Lawrence Mantin, Mickey Allmon, Sharon Strong, Gerald McCauley, Jayson Davidson, Lan Zhao, Daphne Talbot, Clayton Adams, David Flanagan, John Craig, Debbie Fisher, Vicki Smallwood, Pamela Gail Hayes, Erin Burt, Eleen B Caballero, Joy Jones, Basil Wilcoxson, Lyndall Young, Patty Hazlewood, Elaine Altom, Darell Lantz, Marcella Shiel, Carol Jensen, Richard Campbell, Sam Rice, Mark McCoy, Mistie Winters, Deborah Felts, John Guadalupe, Richard Haskell, Sharon Stewart, Guilidaloe Reyes, Paul Crowl, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Pam Wallace, Lisa Lewis, Heather Trent, Cali Hernandez, Michael Sullivan, Connie Stivers, Delores Carr, David Beebe, Adam Burt, Thomas Maassen, Tony Kralik, William Richmond, Lisa K Bean, Sally Shupack, Blake Barlow, Mae Oma Williams, Sharon Wood, New Dominion LLC, Eric Moore, Laurie Harlow, Laura Tyree, J Ramon Avila, Patrick Maloy, Janet Horn, Matthew Miller, Matthew Hodge, Jordan Breshears, Samuel Reynolds, Roy Jones, Denise Derycke, Shoushan Zeng, Gary Steven Pistole, Karen Thornbrue, Richard Novakowski, Arvil E Smallwood, Chrissy Kralik, J Pat Carter, Staci Richmond, Barron Winters, Edward C Lorenzen, Rebecca Smith, Shirley Witkowski, Ronald Graham, Justin R Barker, Jose Santana, Philip Sadeghy, John Simpson, Shannon Mallett, Nelson Jack Hayes, Ricky Birdwell, William Fogleman, Eugene McDaniel, Witmer Daniel, Karen Moore, Lovenia House, Willie C Washington, Rachelle Caldwell, Holly Rice, Kara Hammer, Katherine Ganther, Kevin Beat, Emily Buchanan, Allen Burke, James Doss, Stan Weiss, Brandon K Thornbrue, Kelly Novakowski, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Jared Black, Robin A Lang, Shannon McDonald, Lynn Harvey, Janice Depew, Stewart Williams, LaJuana Dennis, Mangus Scott, Sr, Betty Claxton, Eric Williams, Anthony Hartz, Keith Harris, Joe L Rodriquez, Misty Graham, Cynthia Graves, William Wolf, Robert Allen, Valma Glover, Rick Sparks, Evelyn Nephew, James Skipper, Lisa Stafford, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Stephanie Milburn, Gary Jones, James Pike, Martha Newcomb, Angela Schwall, Mary Travis, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Jane Louise Anderson, Marca Bennett, Jerry Novakowski, Janice Movlai, Arnold Burkett, Lauri Monetti, Alverna Black, Larry Starns, Jerry McGee, Misty Dawn Pritchard, James McCaughtry, Rebecca Ridgewell, Carolyn Campbell, Carol Fadaiepour, Shalana Robb Moad, Angela Watson, Greg Vollmer, Kelly Murphree, Harold Caskey, Robert Alexander, Sr, Ronald D Bryen, Rachel Miller, Rita D Jones, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Jennie Kiser, Debra Stanaland, Nancy Starns, Grover Turner, April Marler, Barbara Bunt, Jerry Calhoun, Dawn Croteau, Tonda Robinson, Paula Levan, George N Chacko, Sherri Peters, Jason G Henson, Clyde Dorr, Jim Tatum, Louise Main, Frank Riley, Steven Moyer, Sam Croteau, David Swanson, Caron Jarvis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Larry Murphree, Gamm Debora, Gary Piersol, Mickey Nixon, Scott Potter, Jim E Bean, James Wallace, Dan Vogel, Shirley Chesser, John Thomas, James E Horn, Larry Jaynes, Carolyn Lunn, Jackie McCaughtry, John Secondi, Darren Peters, Kenneth Wolf, Raymond Jordan, Thomas Thomas, John Milburn, Bill Fuller, Gary McDonald, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Cole Newby, Carol Corey, Betty A Foster, Keith Dougherty, Keith Warrior, Jeremy Smart, Prentiss Nephew, Gayle Caskey, Russell Ray Pollard, Arthur Ganther, Sam Harvey, Robert Traylor, Jeri Allmon, Brian Stanaland, Raymond Berlioz, Bradley Casper, Julia Frias, Mohammad Rahimi, Sarah Pressgrove, James Durley, Dawne Sullivan, Evelyn Colbert, Glenda Fogleman, Shannon Piersol, George Welch, Debra Brennan Brennan, James Thomas, Robert Lang, Wes Perry, Alberta Welch, Sydney Fuller, Michael Key, Kelly Key, Rick Farmer, Inman House, R.L. Montgomery, Alexander T Lunn, Marca Lea Bennett, Mitzi Potter, Thomas Pressgrove, Ron Wooden, Alvina Wilks, Lisa Birdwell, Raven Crowl, Raymond Henneha, Alvis McAffrey, Shannon Williams, Nancy J Dye, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, Denise Austin, Carla Maloy, Marshall Dunlap, III Cleovis Watson, Rene Buss, Kathryn Aitken, Eva Wooden, Debra Novakowski, Marsha K Sanders, Scott Tyree, Leroy Anderson, M.D. John Mirjanich, Cathy Perry, Bill Gardner, Marcos Chavez, Sonia Vega, Eldridge H Kindle, Vali Fadaiepour, Margaret Reeves, Deborah Calhoun, Charles Canning, James Cooke, Cheryl A Burkett, Jose Luis Bosquez, James Shiel, Ben Young, Ardishir Amighi, Robert Mallett, Krystal Thornbrue, Mitchell C Elmore, John Bunt, Kassidy Laesch, Kenneth Campbell, Donna Dorr, Jeanette Pendley, Glyn Ridgewell, Larry Friend, James Jackson, Donald Kincaid and John Mirjanich
Case Number: 5:2021cv00547
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ANSWER to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's First #6 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa by New Dominion LLC. (Jayne, Andrew)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Order of Admission of Scott Poynter Under Local Rule 83.2. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/26/2022. (mb)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 9/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/15/2022; Pla witness list due 9/15/2022; Pla exhibit list due 9/15/2022; Motions in limine due 12/2/2022; Jury instructions due 12/2/2022; Voir dire requests due 12/2/2022; Discovery due by 11/3/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 10/3/2022. Pretrial Report due by 12/2/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/25/2022. (mb)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Amend Its Answer to Assert Counterclaims Against National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/21/2022. (kmt)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Strand, Orion)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Answer to Assert Counterclaims Against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA by New Dominion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Amendment)(Jayne, Andrew)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Order for Admission of Scott Poynter to Bar of this Court by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Poarch, David)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Subpoena by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Poarch, David)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Poarch, David)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, New Dominion LLC, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Poarch, David)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/13/2022. (mb)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 10:10 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 1/24/2022. (mb)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Jared Black, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts.(Poarch, David)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Plaintiffs Second Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service. Service of Process to be completed by 2/23/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/2/2021. (mb)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal , Voluntary - Chacko Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Defendants)(Holden, Steven)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Holden, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION for Agreed Responsive Pleading, Amended Date by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Defendants)(Holden, Steven)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION for Agreed Responsive Pleading Date by All Plaintiffs. (Holden, Steven)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by David A Poarch, Jr on behalf of Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts (Poarch, David)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by David A Poarch, Jr on behalf of Kathryn Aitken, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, David Ball, Blake Barlow, David Beebe, Raymond Berlioz, Earl White, Shannon White, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Roland Lozier, Thomas Maassen, Lawrence Mantin, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Robert Traylor, Dan Vogel, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Arthur Ganther, Chris Gillespie, Rona Goodeagle, John Guadalupe, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Joy Jones, Kassidy Laesch, Linda Lavender, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Raymond Henneha, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Michael Preston, Gary Puterka, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Betty Claxton, Shirley Coleman, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Samuel Reynolds, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Tonda Robinson, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, John Mirjanich, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, LaJuana Dennis, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, James Doss, Steven Dummer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts (Poarch, David)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #22 Plaintiffs filing of a Stipulation for Acceptance of Service and Agreed Response Date National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. The Court declines to approve the Stipulation at this time or to issue the proposed order submitted with it. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/16/2021. (mb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Holden, Steven)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION for Acceptance of Service & Agreed Response Date by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation for Acceptance of Service)(Holden, Steven)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Julia Frias, Carol Jensen, Christine Leavitt, Julie Holbrook, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour.(White, Edward)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of Julia Frias, Carol Jensen, Christine Leavitt, Julie Holbrook, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour (White, Edward)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A McVicker on behalf of New Dominion LLC (McVicker, Jason)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew C Jayne on behalf of New Dominion LLC (Jayne, Andrew)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by New Dominion LLC.(Jayne, Andrew)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service. Plaintiff is granted an additional 90 days to complete service of process on all named Defendants. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/27/2021. (mb)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. New Dominion LLC served on 8/25/2021. (Strand, Orion)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to New Dominion LLC. (kmt)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Holden, Steven)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Orion A Strand on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Strand, Orion)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Hafner; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Fink; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William O. Williams. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/3/2021. (mb)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William O. Williams III Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729365 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of William O. Williams III)(Holden, Steven)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Fink Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729361 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of Matthew J. Fink)(Holden, Steven)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Hafner Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729358 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of Charles A. Hafner)(Holden, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven E Holden on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa (Holden, Steven)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Van Meir, Ellen)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court finds insufficient factual allegations to establish the existence of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended pleading within 14 days of this date to cure the deficiencies identified in this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/3/2021. (mb)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa . (Van Meir, Ellen)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/28/2021. (llg)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Stephen P. Friot recused. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/28/2021. (llg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa v. New Dominion LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Kralik
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gardner
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary H. Smith
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Lozier
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Depew
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagelene Tyree
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Hernandez
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Harlow
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Preston
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Weiss
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Duesterhaus
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Wolf
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ball
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Roberts
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Maxwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schwall
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Talbot
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wood
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Howard
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan McGee
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith H Finley
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Campbell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Colson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Williams
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Travis
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Hodge
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Moyer
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fuller
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Leard
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Puterka
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy R Maxey
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Jackson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Doss
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Lynn McCracken
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Norman Smith
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Colbert
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Ribera
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parvin Sadeghy
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Peters
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dummer
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Leavitt
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Buss
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty B Ellerby
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Carr
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon K Bryen
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Atkinson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad K Harber
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Haskell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Simpson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Thornbrue
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbas Movlai
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Ash
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raelene Neighbors
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Pierre
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Montgomery, III
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lavender
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cheatham
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalyla Hudson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neile Blackwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri McCoy
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Caldwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Tischauser
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Harwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Lee Maguire
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Crews
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Pendley, Sr
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marieca Pilcher
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Newby
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauralee Hartz
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Ann Bruce
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Lemonier
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Harris
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Buchanan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sweatte
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Jaynes
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Helberg
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa McDaniel
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Terry Felts
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Neighbors
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ediwin House
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davinna Allensworth
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coleman
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenton Jaynes
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wolf
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Brewer
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Holbrook
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gillespie
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lin Copper
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Monetti
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Ward
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa M Kindle
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Main
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacheverjuan Bennett
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Cooper
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Jordan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Douglas Stafford
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Annesley
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Sparks
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Levan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rona Goodeagle
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Torres
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americ Leeviraphan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Leard
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace J Dotson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Brewer
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie S Chacko
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy B Dougherty
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Griggs
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Tischauser
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saundra Taylor
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Sappington
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Mantin
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Allmon
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Strong
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McCauley
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Davidson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan Zhao
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Talbot
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Adams
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flanagan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Craig
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Fisher
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Smallwood
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Gail Hayes
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Burt
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleen B Caballero
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Jones
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basil Wilcoxson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndall Young
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hazlewood
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Altom
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darell Lantz
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella Shiel
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Jensen
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Campbell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Rice
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McCoy
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mistie Winters
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Felts
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Guadalupe
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Haskell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Stewart
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guilidaloe Reyes
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Crowl
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan W.T. Lewis
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Wallace
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Lewis
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Trent
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cali Hernandez
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Stivers
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Carr
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beebe
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Burt
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Maassen
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Kralik
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Richmond
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa K Bean
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Shupack
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Barlow
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mae Oma Williams
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wood
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Dominion LLC
Represented By: Andrew C Jayne
Represented By: Jason A McVicker
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Moore
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Harlow
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Tyree
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ramon Avila
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Maloy
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Horn
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Miller
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hodge
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Breshears
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Reynolds
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Jones
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Derycke
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoushan Zeng
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Steven Pistole
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Thornbrue
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Novakowski
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvil E Smallwood
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrissy Kralik
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Pat Carter
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci Richmond
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron Winters
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C Lorenzen
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Smith
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Witkowski
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Graham
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin R Barker
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Santana
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Sadeghy
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Simpson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Mallett
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Jack Hayes
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Birdwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fogleman
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene McDaniel
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witmer Daniel
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Moore
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovenia House
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie C Washington
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Caldwell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Rice
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Hammer
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Ganther
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Beat
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Buchanan
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Burke
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doss
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Weiss
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon K Thornbrue
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Novakowski
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Hill-Wiggly
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Black
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin A Lang
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon McDonald
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Harvey
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Depew
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Williams
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaJuana Dennis
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangus Scott, Sr
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Claxton
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Williams
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hartz
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Harris
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe L Rodriquez
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Graham
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Graves
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wolf
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valma Glover
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sparks
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Nephew
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Skipper
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stafford
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Diaz- Bosquez
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Milburn
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Jones
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pike
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Newcomb
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Schwall
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Travis
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar C Smart, Sr
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Louise Anderson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marca Bennett
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Novakowski
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Movlai
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Burkett
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauri Monetti
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alverna Black
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Starns
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry McGee
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Dawn Pritchard
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCaughtry
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Ridgewell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Campbell
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Fadaiepour
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalana Robb Moad
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Watson
Represented By: David A Poarch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web