Shepherd et al v. Yiwu Thousandshores E-Business Co Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Shepherd and DeAnn Shepherd
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon Fulfillment Services Inc, Amazon Inc, Yiwu Thousandshores E-Business Co Ltd, Thousandshores Inc and Amazon.com Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00564
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd. Amazon.com Services LLC served on 7/6/2021. (Pignato, Gerard)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd. Amazon Inc served on 7/2/2021. (Pignato, Gerard)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd. Thousandshores Inc served on 7/6/2021. (Pignato, Gerard)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, Thousandshores Inc. (kmt)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew C Kane on behalf of DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd (Kane, Matthew)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerard F Pignato on behalf of DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd (Pignato, Gerard)
June 4, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3696780. (Pignato, Gerard)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, Thousandshores Inc, Yiwu Thousandshores E-Business Co Ltd filed by DeAnn Shepherd, Shannon Shepherd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd et al v. Yiwu Thousandshores E-Business Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Thousandshores E-Business Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thousandshores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Shepherd
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Represented By: Gerard F Pignato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnn Shepherd
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Represented By: Gerard F Pignato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?