Donehue et al v. Apache Corporation
Plaintiff: Kindall Leigh Donehue and Andrew Joseph Donehue
Defendant: Apache Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv00710
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Banner on behalf of Apache Corporation (Banner, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apache Corporation.(Williams, D)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Kenyon Williams on behalf of Apache Corporation (Williams, D)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kindall Leigh Donehue, Andrew Joseph Donehue. Apache Corporation served on 7/19/2021. (Neller, Corey)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Apache Corporation. (kmt)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick R Pearce, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pearce, Patrick)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Corey A Neller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neller, Corey)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip G Whaley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whaley, Phillip)
July 15, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3722140. (Whaley, Phillip)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apache Corporation filed by Kindall Leigh Donehue, Andrew Joseph Donehue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donehue et al v. Apache Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kindall Leigh Donehue
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph Donehue
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corporation
Represented By: D Kenyon Williams
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?