Wells v. Galfab LLC et al
Plaintiff: Britaney Nicole Wells
Defendant: Galfab LLC, Galfab Holdings Inc and Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00761
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc.(Chancellor, Bart)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Galfab Holdings Inc, Galfab LLC.(Bell, Shannon)
September 20, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Louie Jefferson Cook on behalf of Britaney Nicole Wells (Cook, Louie)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #11 , #12 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/16/2021. (kmt)
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Britaney Nicole Wells.(Hopper, Hailey)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louie J. Cook. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/3/2021. (mb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 18 Receipt for Money Received from Britaney Nicole Wells in the amount of $50, receipt number OKW500087046 regarding #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louie J. Cook (dtb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louie J. Cook by Britaney Nicole Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hopper, Hailey)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Third Amended Complaint due within 10 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/31/2021. (mb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Defendant Premier Truck Sales & Rental, Inc. filed by Britaney Nicole Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Third Amended Complaint)(Hopper, Hailey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Defendants Galfab LLC and Galfab Holdings Inc. filed by Britaney Nicole Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Third Amended Complaint)(Hopper, Hailey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Britaney Nicole Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Third Amended Complaint)(Hopper, Hailey)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc. (Chancellor, Bart)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Galfab Holdings Inc, Galfab LLC. (Bell, Shannon)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by D Bowen Berry on behalf of Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc (Berry, D)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerald P Green on behalf of Britaney Nicole Wells (Green, Gerald)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Hailey M Hopper on behalf of Britaney Nicole Wells (Hopper, Hailey)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc . (Chancellor, Bart)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Bart A Chancellor on behalf of Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc (Chancellor, Bart)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (DeWitt, Derrick)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Defendants . (DeWitt, Derrick)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Derrick T DeWitt on behalf of All Defendants (DeWitt, Derrick)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon S Bell on behalf of Galfab Holdings Inc, Galfab LLC, Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc (Bell, Shannon)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-2783 filed by Galfab LLC, Galfab Holdings Inc, Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Action Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email Confirming Hayes' Citizenship, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)
August 2, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3733363. (DeWitt, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Galfab LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britaney Nicole Wells
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Represented By: Louie Jefferson Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galfab LLC
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: Shannon S Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galfab Holdings Inc
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: Shannon S Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc
Represented By: Bart A Chancellor
Represented By: D Bowen Berry
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: Shannon S Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?