Nichols et al v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: Hannah Nichols, AN and GN
Defendant: Jonath Gipson and Loadtex Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00779
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steece, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #6 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/29/2021. (mb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Taremi, Mehry)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas J Steece on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steece, Thomas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Against Defendant Jonath Gipson and Defendant Loadtex Inc. against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Steece, Thomas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Loadtex Inc.(Taremi, Mehry)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jonath Gipson. (Taremi, Mehry)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy M Taylor on behalf of All Defendants (Taylor, Amy)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of All Defendants (Taremi, Mehry)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-2020 filed by Jonath Gipson, Loadtex Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Def Gipsons Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols et al v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Nichols
Represented By: Cameron S Farnsworth
Represented By: Thomas J Steece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AN
Represented By: Cameron S Farnsworth
Represented By: Thomas J Steece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN
Represented By: Cameron S Farnsworth
Represented By: Thomas J Steece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonath Gipson
Represented By: Amy M Taylor
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loadtex Inc
Represented By: Amy M Taylor
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?