Moyer v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Ashley Moyer
Defendant: Mary Stinnett, Katherine E Thomas, Phillip C Corley, Virginia Banks, Mary Moyer, Jimmy Oliver, Melissa Griner DeLacerda, Justin Brown, Kelli Price and Lisa Thompson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00817
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/14/21. (lb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory Ashley Moyer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Gregory Moyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Report (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Order Regarding Plaintiff's Children (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Support Order for Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D - Rental Car Receipt, #5 Exhibit E - Flight Payment Receipt, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Travel, #7 Exhibit G - Legal Bills, #8 Exhibit H - Health and Counseling Services, #9 Exhibit I - Pay Stub, #10 Exhibit J - Pay Stub, #11 Envelope) (kmt)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as to Gregory Ashley Moyer (kah)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 9 SUMMONS(ES) by Gregory Ashley Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Virginia Banks, Justin Brown, Phillip C Corley, Melissa Griner DeLacerda, Jimmy Oliver, Kelli Price, Mary Stinnett, Katherine E Thomas, Lisa Thompson filed by Gregory Ashley Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FD-2015-458 Degree of Divorce, #2 Exhibit 2 - FD-2015-458 Journal Entry, #3 Envelope)(kah)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must supplement his application on or before 9/10/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/20/21. (lb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Ashley Moyer Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/20/2021. (kah)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory Ashley Moyer. (kah)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Virginia Banks, Justin Brown, Phillip C Corley, Melissa Griner DeLacerda, Jimmy Oliver, Kelli Price, Mary Stinnett, Katherine E Thomas, Lisa Thompson filed by Gregory Ashley Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine E Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip C Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Griner DeLacerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ashley Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?