Draper v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Jamar J Draper
Defendant: Warden Jimmy Martin, FNU Zender and FNU Barker
Case Number: 5:2021cv00827
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER -- On September 15, 2021 Plaintiff paid fifty ($50.00) toward the required initial partial payment of $190.44. For the reasons detailed in this Order, the Court sua sponte extends the Plaintiff's deadline to pay the full initial partial filing fee to October 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/30/2021. (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Jamar J Draper in the amount of $50, receipt number OKW500087303 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance is $300. Receipt mailed to Jamar J Draper#632458SAYRE-NFCC1605 E MainSayre, OK 73662 (dtb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Jamar Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (knt)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee, and his Motion is granted. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before September 13, 2021 Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $190.44. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/26/2021. (mc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin.. Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/23/2021. (kmt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Bernard M. Jones for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/23/2021. (kmt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
August 23, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, #4 Enter Order, #5 Enter Order to: Jamar J Draper#632458SAYRE-NFCC1605 E MainSayre, OK 73662 (kmt)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamar J Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Barker, Jimmy Martin, FNU Zender filed by Jamar J Draper. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Documents from CIV-21-167-J, #2 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar J Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jimmy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Zender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?