Mays v. Grady County Jail
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Defendant: Grady County Jail
Case Number: 5:2021cv00877
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Preserve Jail Recordings" by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended Plaintiffs action Doc #1 re Temporary Restraining Order or Injunctive relief against officials be dismissed as moot. Objections to R&R due by 11/10/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/21/2021. (cps)
October 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 Receipt for Money Received from Otis Mays in the amount of $13.12, receipt number OKW500087677 regarding #1 . Receipt mailed to: Otis Mays #21013 ELK RIVER-CJ Sherburne County Jail 13880 Business Center Drive Suite 200 Elk River, MN 55330. Balance remaining: $336.88. (knt)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/29/2021. (cps)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Authorized Prisoner Official, #2 Exhibit 2 - Inmate Account Summary, #3 Envelope)(jjs)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays (jjs)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE titled, "Dear Clerk of the Court" by Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, as to Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Returned Mail Contents) (jjs)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Returned Mail Contents) (jjs)
September 14, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #7 Letter, a response to the letter and a blank Pro Se guide to Otis Mays ELK RIVER-CJ Sherburne County Jail 13880 Business Center Drive Elk River, MN 55330 (jjs)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter Envelope, #2 Attachment 2 - OKWD Address, #3 Envelope) (jjs)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 1st day of October, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/13/2021. (cps)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/09/2021. (jjs)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NO PREVIOUS Cases (jjs)
September 9, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, the docket sheet, and #5 Enter Order to Otis Mays GRADY COUNTY JAIL 215 N 3RD ST CHICKSHA, OK 73018 (jjs)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00360.
September 2, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #2 ) (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 9/8/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : transferring to OKWD, transferring case (terminates case) (Documents Terminated: #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) (pll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 9/8/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Otis Mays (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 9/8/2021.]
September 1, 2021 ***Remark: copy of Dkt#1 forwarded to Eighth Circuit via email per LC-5 (Re: #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 9/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Grady County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?