Mays v. Grady County Law Enforcement Center et al
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Defendant: Grady County Law Enforcement Center, Sergent Nye, Sgt Sheldon, Officer Riley, Officer Wright, John Doe, Medical, Lt Tucker, O Lancey, Jane Doe, LT Lenny, Dr Maliki, Corpral Pinya, Corprail Maples, Corpral Hanson, Sgt Tucker, Capt Forsythe, Capt Carpenter, Grady County, Unknown Medical Company, Correctional Officer Folower and CO Cade
Case Number: 5:2021cv00992
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff must pay his initial partial filing fee on or before December 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 12/6/2021. (rb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 ENTER ORDER striking #15 Letter. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/3/21. (lb)
December 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Otis Mays. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
December 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Preserve Jail Recordings and All Files and Documents" by Otis Mays. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 STRICKEN~LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs) Stricken by #18 Enter Order on 12/3/2021 (lb).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $16.10 on or before 12/8/21. Plaintiff must make monthly payments until he has paid the total filing fee of $350. The Clerk of the Court will not issue process until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/17/21. (lb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document 12, #2 Exhibit 2 - Inmate Account Summary, #3 Envelope)(jjs)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Letter. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for an extension of time. Plaintiff must either pay the full filing fee or properly move for IFP status on or before 11/23/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/26/21. (lb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies by 11/2/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/12/21. (lb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell.. Signed at the direction of Judge Charles Goodwin on 10/12/21. (dtb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Judge Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to case. Signed at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/12/21. (dtb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00422.
October 7, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis , #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) (see document number #4 ) (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/12/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, transferring case (terminates case) (lah, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/12/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Otis Mays (blc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/12/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Otis Mays (blc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/12/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Otis Mays (blc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Grady County Law Enforcement Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady County Law Enforcement Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergent Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Lancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Lenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Maliki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpral Pinya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corprail Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpral Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Forsythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Folower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?