GM Roberts Inc v. Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: GM Roberts Inc The United States of America for the Use and Benefit Of doing business as Corrosion Eliminators
Defendant: Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC doing business as C3-LLC, C3-SMR and Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00993
Filed: October 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of C3-SMR (Lewis, Kerry)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC (Lewis, Kerry)
November 30, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by C3-SMR . (Clark, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric L Clark on behalf of C3-SMR (Clark, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by C3-SMR.(Clark, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC . (Clark, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric L Clark on behalf of Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC (Clark, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC.(Clark, Eric)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GM Roberts Inc. Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC served on 11/16/2021. (Kennemer, Cara)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GM Roberts Inc. C3-SMR served on 11/9/2021. (Kennemer, Cara)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Lexon Insurance Company . (Clark, Eric)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lexon Insurance Company.(Clark, Eric)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of Lexon Insurance Company (Lewis, Kerry)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric L Clark on behalf of Lexon Insurance Company (Clark, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GM Roberts Inc. Lexon Insurance Company served on 10/25/2021. (Kennemer, Cara)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Cara D Kennemer on behalf of GM Roberts Inc (Kennemer, Cara)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cara D. Kennemer. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/26/2021. (mb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3786172 by GM Roberts Inc. (Fenton, Christopher)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to C3-SMR, Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC, Lexon Insurance Company. (kmt)
October 12, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3778015. (Fenton, Christopher)
October 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C3-SMR, Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC, Lexon Insurance Company filed by GM Roberts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GM Roberts Inc v. Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GM Roberts Inc The United States of America for the Use and Benefit Of doing business as Corrosion Eliminators
Represented By: Christopher J Fenton
Represented By: Cara D Kennemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cueto Consulting and Construction LLC doing business as C3-LLC
Represented By: Eric L Clark
Represented By: Kerry R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C3-SMR
Represented By: Eric L Clark
Represented By: Kerry R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric L Clark
Represented By: Kerry R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?