Morgan v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: David Brian Morgan
Defendant: United States of America, Kevin Stitt, Director DOC Scott Crow and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2021cv01067
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #16 Report and Recommendation.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/8/2021. (mb)
December 6, 2021 Filing 17 Receipt for Money Received from David Brian Morgan in the amount of $402, receipt number OKW5000088349 regarding Docket Annotation Receipt mailed to: David Brian Morgan #637673 LEXINGTON-JHCC P O Box 548 Lexington, OK 73051 (kah)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- Because Plaintiff does not qualify for authorization to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, it is recommended that Plaintiff's Motions, ECF Nos. #2 and #7 be DENIED and that he be ordered to prepay the full $402.00 filing fee for this action to proceed. It is further recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling unless Plaintiff pays the $402.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within twenty (20) days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation. This report and recommendation does not terminate the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/19/2021. (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION titled, "Motion to Transfer Venue Back to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia and Motion to Add Defendants" by David Brian Morgan. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed at the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/4/21. (dtb)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed at the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 11/4/21. (dtb)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01546.
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Oklahoma. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 10/26/2021. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/06/2021. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/23/2021. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 08/27/2021 Minute Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Discovery, by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's #4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and, within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with a certified copy of his trust fund account statement, including the supporting ledger sheets, for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's #5 Motion to Compel, #5 Motion for Discovery, and motion to appoint counsel are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/27/21. (psu2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Discovery by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Extension to Pay Filing Fee by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 06/17/2021. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT CROW, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, KEVIN STITT, UNITED STATES with Jury Demand filed by DAVID BRIAN MORGAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Notice) (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/07/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brian Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director DOC Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?