Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Bartels et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Defendant: Amy Bartels, David Batton Law, Washington Regional Medical Center, United States Department of the Air Force, Mail Handlers Benefit Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America The and OU Medicine Inc doing business as OU Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2021cv01068
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Department of the Air Force. (Spurlock, Alison)
March 10, 2023 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arkansas Police Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - corr dtd 5.10.18, #3 Exhibit 3 - US lien, #4 Exhibit 4 - Washington RMC lien, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sedgewick lien, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mail Handlers lien, #7 Exhibit 7 - corr from Plf's csl to csl for Bartels dtd 1.19.18, #8 Exhibit 8 - corr from US dtd 1.13.21, #9 Exhibit 9 - corr from Plf dtd 1.19.21, #10 Exhibit 10 - Tricare email to Prog dtd 1.13.21, #11 Exhibit 11 - 10-CV-1252 Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 - 10-CV-1252 Memo in Supp of Plf's MSJ, #13 Exhibit 13 - 15-CV-656 Plf Resp to MTD, #14 Exhibit 14 - 13-CV-863 Complaint in Interpleader, #15 Exhibit 15 - 13-CV-863 - USDHS Ans & Cntclm)(Roberson, Brad)
February 21, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss by United States Department of the Air Force. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stallcup Order)(Spurlock, Alison)
February 21, 2023 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Alison Spurlock on behalf of United States Department of the Air Force (Spurlock, Alison)
February 10, 2023 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Roberson, Brad)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall have until February 13, 2023, to properly serve the United States Department of the Air Force. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 1/3/2023. (ks)
December 29, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Amended Complaint and Summons Upon USAF by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - corr from Lynda Beck dtd 04.23.18, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service re U.S. Attorney's Office dtd 12.21.22, #3 Exhibit 3 - Attempted serve re AG Merrick dtd 12.20.22, #4 Exhibit 4 - Attempted serve re General Counsel dtd 12.20.22, #5 Exhibit 5 - USPS tracking, #6 Exhibit 6 - certified mailers dtd 12.29.22)(Roberson, Brad)
December 16, 2022 Filing 32 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Air Force. (rr)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until December 30, 2022, to properly serve the United States Department of the Air Force. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/14/2022. (so)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren N Watson terminated. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/13/2022. (so)
December 12, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Watson, Lauren)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Amended Complaint and Summons by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Corr from L. Beck dtd 4.23.18)(Roberson, Brad)
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Roberson, Brad)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause in writing, on or before November 23, 2022, why their claims against the United States Department of the Air Force should not be dismissed for failure to properly serve a defendant. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 11/15/2022. (ks)
November 1, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Washington Regional Medical Center, United States Department of the Air Force, and OU Medicine, Inc. d/b/a OU Medical Center by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - USPS Tracking)(Neighbors, Zachary)
September 22, 2022 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SUMMONS Certified Mail service of Doc. No. 17 - Amended Complaint in Interpleader upon Defendant, Washington Regional Medical Center by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Neighbors, Zachary)
September 22, 2022 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SUMMONS Certified Mail service of Doc. No. 17 - Amended Complaint in Interpleader upon Defendant, United States Department of the Air Force by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Neighbors, Zachary)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Judge Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 09/20/22. (wh)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 09/20/22. (wh)
September 1, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. OU Medicine Inc served on 6/15/2022. (Neighbors, Zachary)
June 20, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint, by Mail Handlers Benefit Plan.(Howard, Alison)
June 8, 2022 Filing 18 Summons Issued Electronically as to OU Medicine Inc. (dtb)
June 6, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amy Bartels, David Batton Law, Mail Handlers Benefit Plan, United States Department of the Air Force, Washington Regional Medical Center filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec Page (Moto), #2 Exhibit Dec Page (Auto))(Neighbors, Zachary)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend Complaint in Interpleader. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 06/01/22. (wh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Amend Complaint in Interpleader by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3.2.22 corr, #2 Exhibit Am Comp in Interpleader)(Neighbors, Zachary)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary L Neighbors on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Neighbors, Zachary)
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad L Roberson on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Prudential ltr dtd 03.02.22)(Watson, Lauren)
February 8, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Mail Handlers Benefit Plan.(Howard, Alison)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Alison M. Howard on behalf of Mail Handlers Benefit Plan (Howard, Alison)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Mail Handlers Benefit Plan served on 1/18/2022. (Watson, Lauren)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by David J Batton on behalf of Amy Bartels, David Batton Law (Batton, David)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT ANSWER to Complaint by Amy Bartels, David Batton Law.(Batton, David)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. United States Department of the Air Force served on 11/9/2021. (Roberson, Brad)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Washington Regional Medical Center served on 11/9/2021. (Roberson, Brad)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Prudential Insurance Company of America The served on 11/8/2021. (Roberson, Brad)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. David Batton Law served on 11/8/2021. (Roberson, Brad)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Amy Bartels, David Batton Law, Mail Handlers Benefit Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America The, United States Department of the Air Force, Washington Regional Medical Center. (kah)
November 4, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3793702. (Watson, Lauren)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Bartels, David Batton Law, Mail Handlers Benefit Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America The, United States Department of the Air Force, Washington Regional Medical Center filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Progressive Motorcycle Insurance Coverage Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - Progressive Auto Insurance Coverage Summary, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Bartels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Represented By: Lauren N Watson
Represented By: Zachary L Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Bartels
Represented By: David J Batton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Batton Law
Represented By: David J Batton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Alison Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Handlers Benefit Plan
Represented By: Alison M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OU Medicine Inc doing business as OU Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?