Eckardt v. Nunn
Petitioner: Kyle Richard Eckardt
Respondent: John O'Connell, Director DOC Scott Crow, John M O and Scott Nunn
Case Number: 5:2022cv00061
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Order by Kyle Richard Eckardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(so)
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Order by Kyle Richard Eckardt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - OKED Forwarding Envelope, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Petitioner's failure to comply with this Court's orders. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 2/15/2022. (mc)
February 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received from Kyle Richard Eckardt in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500089241 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed receipt to Kyle Richard Eckardt #575169 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337 (jjs)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Order and IFP form, as to Kyle Eckardt (kmt)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER -- Petitioner has neither paid the filing fee in accordance with 1914 and LCvR3.2 nor submitted a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than February 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/25/2022. (mc)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/21/2022. (kmt)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Judge Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/21/2022. (kmt)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:22-cv-00025.
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma. (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/21/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Terminating Scott Crow and John O'Connor as respondents in this action. Petitioner is incarcerated at James Crabtree Correctional Center, and the warden of that facility is the proper respondent in this case. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Kyle R. Eckardt, Petitioner, v. Scott Nunn, Warden, Respondent.1. (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/21/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-22-25-JFH-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/21/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Kyle R. Eckardt (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckardt v. Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John M O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle Richard Eckardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?