Smith v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Lester Smith
Defendant: Amir Kennedy and Chapar, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00334
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 02/15/2023; Jury instructions due 02/15/2023; Voir dire requests due 02/15/2023; Trial briefs due 02/15/2023; Discovery due by 12/1/2022. Jury Trial set on the court's 03/2023 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Judge Joe Heaton. Motions due by 12/15/2022. Pretrial Report due by 2/15/2023. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 06/07/2022. (lam)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER the 06/08/2022 scheduling conference is stricken...initial disclosures are due by 06/08/2022...see separate scheduling order for specific deadlines. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 06/07/2022. (lam)
May 25, 2022 Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Raymond Lester Smith. (Keogh, Greg)
May 11, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Amir Kennedy.(Felty, Michael)
May 11, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Chapar, LLC.(Felty, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 plaintiff's motion for substitution of counsel as follows: the clerk of court is directed to strike Christian Smith, Esq., and Richard Harris, Esq., as counsel of record for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 05/10/2022. (lam)
May 9, 2022 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan D Rex on behalf of Raymond Lester Smith (Rex, Nathan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Raymond Lester Smith. (Keogh, Greg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg S Keogh on behalf of Raymond Lester Smith (Keogh, Greg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 22 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 06/08/2022 @ 10:10 AM in Chambers before Judge Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 05/30/2022. (lam)
April 28, 2022 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan W Barr on behalf of Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy (Barr, Jonathan)
April 27, 2022 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael C Felty on behalf of Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy (Felty, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for the parties to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 04/29/2022. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/25/2022. (lam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:21-cv-01526.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Change of Venue. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion by Defendants Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Motion by Plaintiff Raymond Lester Smith.. Replies due by 10/4/2021. (Smith, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Change of Venue by Defendants Amir Kennedy and Chapar, LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2021. (Godinho, Vincent) Modified on 10/1/2021 to add additional filer (SLD). [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/8/2022. Motions due by 3/10/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that I deem my order satisfied and I will not remand the case at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Raymond Lester Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that defendants Amir Kennedy and Chapar, LLC shall show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 9/3/2021 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Chapar, LLC re #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendants Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chapar, LLC, Amir Kennedy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-836815-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6598817) by Amir Kennedy, Chapar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Terry, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 4/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lester Smith
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Christian Z Smith
Represented By: Greg S Keogh
Represented By: Nathan D Rex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Kennedy
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Vincent Michael Godinho
Represented By: Jonathan W Barr
Represented By: Michael C Felty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapar, LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Vincent Michael Godinho
Represented By: Jonathan W Barr
Represented By: Michael C Felty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?