Sherfield et al v. Bonner et al
Plaintiff: DeAngelo Sherfield and Icandee Refinishing LLC
Defendant: Judge FNU Bonner and Judge FNU Stallings
Case Number: 5:2022cv00384
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order, as to DeAngelo Sherfield (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Returned Mail Contents) (jjs)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may either file an amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the required filing fee for a civil case of $402 within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 06/02/2022. (jb)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to DeAngelo Sherfield (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Returned Mail Contents) (jjs)
May 11, 2022 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form and #1 Complaint to DeAngelo Sherfield 8001 Wilshire Ct Unit F Oklahoma City, OK 73132 (jjs)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DeAngelo Sherfield. (jjs)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Bonner, FNU Stallings filed by DeAngelo Sherfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Disqualification of Trial Judges, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Reply, #3 Exhibit 3 - Legal Notice and Warning, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherfield et al v. Bonner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAngelo Sherfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icandee Refinishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?