Living Investment LLC v. Third Coast Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Living Investment LLC
Defendant: Third Coast Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00442
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Order for Jury Trial by Living Investment LLC. (Goodpasture, David)
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Living Investment LLC. (Goodpasture, David)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Living Investment LLC . (Goodpasture, David)
July 7, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Third Coast Insurance Company . (DeWitt, Derrick)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 8/4/2022; Motions to amend due 8/4/2022; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 3/1/2023; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 3/15/2023; Pla witness list due 3/1/2023; Dft witness list due 3/15/2023; Pla exhibit list due 3/20/2024; Dft exhibit list due 3/27/2023; Stipulations due 5/1/2023; Motions in limine due 5/1/2023; Statement of cs due 5/1/2023; Trial briefs due 5/1/2023; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions due 5/1/2023; Bench Trial set for 6/13/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Discovery due by 5/1/2023. Motions due by 4/3/2023. Pretrial Report due by 5/1/2023.. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/5/22. (ms)
June 30, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Living Investment LLC. (Proctor, David)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Brannon C Dillard on behalf of Third Coast Insurance Company (Dillard, Brannon)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Dewey C Dodson on behalf of Third Coast Insurance Company (Dodson, Dewey)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 09:45 AM before Judge Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 6/30/2022. (ms)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Third Coast Insurance Company.(DeWitt, Derrick)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David B Goodpasture on behalf of Living Investment LLC (Goodpasture, David)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T Goolsby on behalf of Living Investment LLC (Goolsby, Robert)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by David Proctor on behalf of Living Investment LLC (Proctor, David)
June 1, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3918795. (Cunningham, Kevin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2022-2146 filed by Third Coast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Process, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Living Investment LLC v. Third Coast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Investment LLC
Represented By: David B Goodpasture
Represented By: David Proctor
Represented By: Robert T Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Coast Insurance Company
Represented By: Brannon C Dillard
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: Dewey C Dodson
Represented By: Kevin H Cunningham
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?