Sonic Industries LLC et al v. Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Americas Drive In Brand Properties LLC and Sonic Industries Services Inc
Defendant: Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey, Stephen S Snyder, PACNW Gage Drive Ins LLC, PACNorthwest Drive Ins LLC, PACNW PSC Drive Ins LLC, PACNW Wen Drive In LLC, PACNW Ferndale Drive In LLC, PACNW 1st Drive In LLC, Patricia Gregg, Anthony JW Gewald and Andrew Whyte
Case Number: 5:2022cv00449
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim,, and Reply to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs.(Hampton, Joe)
July 26, 2022 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristy Lynn Miamen on behalf of Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Admitting K Miamen Pro Hac Vice)(Miamen, Kristy)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; Kristy L. Miamen is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Defendants, Olympic Cascade Drive Ins, LLC and Richard Ramsey provided counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/25/2022. (ks)
July 22, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ted Tetrick Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - May 2022 Ramsey Reconciliation Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit B - Ramsey 1.10.22 Email to Jennifer Jordan, #4 Exhibit C - Ramsey 12.31.21 Email to Jennifer Jordan, #5 Exhibit 2 - Kenneth Schmetterer Declaration, #6 Exhibit A - Washington Secretary of State Pages, #7 Exhibit 3 - Amber Goldman Declaration, #8 Exhibit A - Ramsey Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit B - Sonic's Franchisee Sales Report, #10 Exhibit C - Royalty Fee Invoice 20561215, #11 Exhibit D - Spreadsheet of Amounts Invoiced to OCDI, #12 Exhibit 4 - E. Edward Saroch Declaration, #13 Exhibit 5 - John Verhey Declaration, #14 Exhibit A - Arbitrator Nolan's June 6, 2022 Order, #15 Exhibit 6 - Shane Thompson Declaration, #16 Exhibit 7 - Suzanne Lindsay Declaration)(Hampton, Joe) Modified on 7/25/2022 (ks).
July 22, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristy L. Miamen Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3954959 by Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Request for PHV Admission)(Oubre, Zachary)
July 22, 2022 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffery S Haff on behalf of Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of admittance to practice in this court)(Haff, Jeffery)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Jeffrey S. Haff is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of defendants Olympic Cascade Drive Ins, LLC and Richard Ramsey, provided counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/20/2022. (ks)
July 20, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Haff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3952999 by Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for PHV Admission)(Oubre, Zachary)
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anthony JW Gewald, Patricia Gregg, Andrew Whyte. (Lissuzzo, Russell)
July 15, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Anthony JW Gewald, Patricia Gregg, Andrew Whyte.(Lissuzzo, Russell)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Defendants Patricia Gregg, Anthony Gewald, and Andrew Whyte's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Response. Defendants shall file any answer or response on or before July 15, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file any consolidated reply on or before July 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/11/2022. (ks)
July 8, 2022 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer and File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Anthony JW Gewald, Patricia Gregg, Andrew Whyte. (Lissuzzo, Russell)
July 8, 2022 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Russell C Lissuzzo, III on behalf of Anthony JW Gewald, Patricia Gregg, Andrew Whyte (Lissuzzo, Russell)
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Americas Drive In Brand Properties LLC. Anthony JW Gewald served on 6/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service of Summons on Anthony J.W. Gewald)(Hampton, Joe)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ramsey Afd, #2 Exhibit 1-1 - 09-02-2021 Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit 1-2 - 11-29-2021 Notice of Termination, #4 Exhibit 1-3 - 12-30-2021 Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit 1-4 - 05-11-2022 Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit 1-5 - Arbitrator's Order on App for Emergency Relief)(Oubre, Zachary)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC by Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09-02-2021 Notice of Default, #2 Exhibit 2 - 11-29-2021 Notice of Termination, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12-30-2021 Notice of Termination, #4 Exhibit 4 - 05-11-2022 Notice of Termination)(Oubre, Zachary)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary A P Oubre on behalf of Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey (Oubre, Zachary)
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael K Avery on behalf of Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, Richard Ramsey (Avery, Michael)
June 28, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth L Schmetterer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schmetterer, Kenneth)
June 28, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John F Verhey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Verhey, John)
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re #5 Brief,,, Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Declaration of E. Edward Saroch, #2 Exhibit 1-A - Trademark List)(Hampton, Joe)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 and #10 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Kenneth Schmetterer and John Verhey are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs, provided each counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 6/21/2022. (ks)
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Verhey Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3931471 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Verhey Request for Admission PHV)(Hampton, Joe)
June 17, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Schmetterer Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3931442 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kenneth Schmetterer Request for Admission PHV)(Hampton, Joe)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Americas Drive In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC . (Hampton, Joe)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sonic Industries Services Inc . (Hampton, Joe)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC, PACNW 1st Drive In LLC, PACNW Ferndale Drive In LLC, PACNW Gage Drive Ins LLC, PACNW PSC Drive Ins LLC, PACNW Wen Drive In LLC, PACNorthwest Drive Ins LLC. (so)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of E. Edward Saroch, #2 Exhibit 2 - Store 5854, #3 Exhibit 3 - Store 5878, #4 Exhibit 4 - Store 5924, #5 Exhibit 5 - Store 5932, #6 Exhibit 6 - Store 5990, #7 Exhibit 7 - Store 5989, #8 Exhibit 8 - Store 6119, #9 Exhibit 9 - Store 6456, #10 Exhibit 10 - Store 6652, #11 Exhibit 11 - Store 6699, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2021/09/02 Financial Default Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2021/11/29 Termination Letter, #14 Exhibit 14 - 2021/12/30 Termination Letter Follow-Up, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2022/04/04 Notice to Close and Deidentify, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2022/05/11 Notice to Close and Deidentify)(Hampton, Joe)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Hampton, Joe)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joe M Hampton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hampton, Joe)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Anthony JW Gewald, Patricia Gregg, Richard Ramsey, Stephen S Snyder, Andrew Whyte. (so)
June 2, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3920501. (Hampton, Joe)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Eddie Saroch Verification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark List, #3 Exhibit 3 - Store 5854, #4 Exhibit 4 - Store 5878, #5 Exhibit 5 - Store 5924, #6 Exhibit 6 - Store 5932, #7 Exhibit 7 - Store 5990, #8 Exhibit 8 - Store 5989, #9 Exhibit 9 - Store 6119, #10 Exhibit 10 - Store 6456, #11 Exhibit 11 - Store 6652, #12 Exhibit 12 - Store 6699, #13 Exhibit 13 - Secured Promissory Note, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonic Industries LLC et al v. Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonic Industries LLC
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: John F Verhey
Represented By: Kenneth L Schmetterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonic Franchising LLC
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: John F Verhey
Represented By: Kenneth L Schmetterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americas Drive In Brand Properties LLC
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: John F Verhey
Represented By: Kenneth L Schmetterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonic Industries Services Inc
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Represented By: John F Verhey
Represented By: Kenneth L Schmetterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Cascade Drive Ins LLC
Represented By: Jeffery S Haff
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Represented By: Michael K Avery
Represented By: Zachary A P Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ramsey
Represented By: Jeffery S Haff
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Represented By: Michael K Avery
Represented By: Zachary A P Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNW Gage Drive Ins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNorthwest Drive Ins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNW PSC Drive Ins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNW Wen Drive In LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNW Ferndale Drive In LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACNW 1st Drive In LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gregg
Represented By: Russell C Lissuzzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony JW Gewald
Represented By: Russell C Lissuzzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Whyte
Represented By: Russell C Lissuzzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?