Locke et al v. Witt et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Locke and Taffy Locke
Defendant: Brian Witt and Tara Witt
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Marily Kay Decker, Angela P Hart, Francis Leo Decker, Jeannette R Bender and Jerome Decker
3Rd Party Defendant: Marilyn Decker, Johnny Shaw doing business as Shaw Real Estate also known as United Country Shaw Real Estate, Anthony Cerar, Co-Trustee of The Francis and Kay Decker Living Trust, Dated July, Jeannette Bender, United Country Shaw Real Estate and Tony Cerar
Case Number: 5:2022cv00535
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Property Damage (P.I
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the parties' joint motion for continuance #17 is granted...the 08/10/2022 civil scheduling conference is continued to the court's 10/2022 scheduling conference docket. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 08/02/2022. (lam)
August 1, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Reschedule Status Conference by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. (Byrd, Colby)
July 27, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Anthony Cerar, Johnny Shaw. (rr)
July 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Third Party Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Johnny Shaw dba Shaw Real Estate aka United Country Shaw Real Estate, Anthony Cerar by Jeannette R Bender, Marily Kay Decker, Francis Leo Decker, Jerome Decker, Angela P Hart.(Verplank, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Verplank on behalf of Jeannette R Bender, Francis Leo Decker, Jerome Decker, Marily Kay Decker, Angela P Hart (Verplank, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard L Rose on behalf of Jeannette R Bender, Francis Leo Decker, Jerome Decker, Marily Kay Decker, Angela P Hart (Rose, Richard)
July 12, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. (Byrd, Colby)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. Jerome Decker served on 7/6/2022. (Byrd, Colby)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. Jeannette R Bender served on 7/6/2022. (Byrd, Colby)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. Marily Kay Decker served on 6/30/2022. (Byrd, Colby)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. Francis Leo Decker served on 6/30/2022. (Byrd, Colby)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 08/10/2022 @ 10:40 AM in Chambers before Judge Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 08/01/2022. (lam)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeannette R Bender, Francis Leo Decker, Jerome Decker, Marily Kay Decker, Angela P Hart. (rr)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Angela P Hart, Francis Leo Decker, Marily Kay Decker, Jeannette R Bender, Jerome Decker by Brian Witt, Tara Witt.(Byrd, Colby)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Allison B Christian on behalf of Brian Witt, Tara Witt (Christian, Allison)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Gatlin C Squires on behalf of Brian Witt, Tara Witt (Squires, Gatlin)
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Colby J Byrd on behalf of Brian Witt, Tara Witt (Byrd, Colby)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kay County District Court, case number CJ-2022-77 filed by Brian Witt, Tara Witt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons to Tara Witt, #4 Exhibit 4 - Issued Summons to Brian Witt, #5 Exhibit 5 - ROS-Tara Witt, #6 Exhibit 6 - ROS-Brian Witt, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)
June 27, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3936525. (Byrd, Colby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke et al v. Witt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Marily Kay Decker
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Angela P Hart
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Francis Leo Decker
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jeannette R Bender
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jerome Decker
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Locke
Represented By: Grace K Yates
Represented By: Richard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taffy Locke
Represented By: Grace K Yates
Represented By: Richard A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Witt
Represented By: Colby J Byrd
Represented By: Gatlin C Squires
Represented By: Allison B Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Witt
Represented By: Colby J Byrd
Represented By: Gatlin C Squires
Represented By: Allison B Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Marilyn Decker
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Johnny Shaw doing business as Shaw Real Estate also known as United Country Shaw Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Anthony Cerar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Co-Trustee of The Francis and Kay Decker Living Trust, Dated July
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeannette Bender
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Represented By: Scott R Verplank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United Country Shaw Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tony Cerar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?