United States of America v. Penn Construction Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Penn Construction Group Incorporated, Korte Construction Company a foreign corporation doing business as The Korte Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv00903
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America . (Magrini, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Korte Construction Company . (Magrini, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America to file within 7 days of this order its Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, using the form available on the Court's website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wp-content/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf). (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/6/2022. (ks)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant Korte Construction Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Defendant Korte Construction Company to file within 7 days of this order its Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, using the form available on the Court's website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wp-content/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf). (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 12/6/2022. (ks)
December 6, 2022 Filing 18 JANUARY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2023 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 12/28/2022. (ks)
November 28, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Korte Construction Company.(Magrini, Robert)
November 28, 2022 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Magrini on behalf of Korte Construction Company (Magrini, Robert)
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Magrini, Robert)
November 21, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Magrini on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Magrini, Robert)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Penn Construction Group Incorporated . (Phansalkar, Kiran)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Penn Construction Group Incorporated.(Phansalkar, Kiran)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Preston M Sullivan, I on behalf of Penn Construction Group Incorporated (Sullivan, Preston)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kiran A Phansalkar on behalf of Penn Construction Group Incorporated (Phansalkar, Kiran)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Korte Construction Company served on 11/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Korte Green Card)(Spitler, William)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Travelers Green Card)(Spitler, William)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Penn Construction Group Incorporated served on 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Penn Green Card)(Spitler, William)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven K Metcalf on behalf of United States of America (Metcalf, Steven)
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by William Spitler on behalf of United States of America (Spitler, William)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by United States of America for the use and benefit of Allied Steel Construction Co., LLC. (Spitler, William)
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from United States of America in the amount of $402, receipt number OKW500092427 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt emailed to wspitler@metcalfspitlerlaw.com. (ekw)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Korte Construction Company, Penn Construction Group Incorporated, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (so)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond (Korte), #2 Exhibit 2 - Waiver Acctg Ledger - Hauling, #3 Exhibit 3 - Kx - Allied TM Proposal (Depot Fuel Maint Hangar), #4 Exhibit 4 - Kx - Allied Crane Rental Proposal, #5 Exhibit 5 - PO P2204 executed, #6 Exhibit 6 - Acctg - Penn Fuel Main (2 Bay) Applied History, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Penn Construction Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven K Metcalf
Represented By: William Spitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Construction Group Incorporated
Represented By: Preston M Sullivan, I
Represented By: Kiran A Phansalkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korte Construction Company a foreign corporation doing business as The Korte Company
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?