Choice Hospice Inc et al v. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Three Rivers Consulting and Management LLC, Choice Hospice Inc an Okllahoma Corporation doing business as Complete Hospice Care Of Oklahoma City, Family Choice Hospice LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Complete Hospice Care, Complete Hospice Care of Eastern Oklahoma and Neighborhood Hospice LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Complete Hospice Care of Southern Oklahoma
Defendant: Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Case Number: 5:2022cv00932
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ~ Denying #15 Defendant's motion to vacate the default judgment and dismiss Plaintiffs' suit; Denying #20 Plaintiffs' motion to strike Defendant's reply for raising new arguments. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/19/2023. (dwl)
April 10, 2023 Filing 25 SURREPLY re #15 MOTION to Vacate and Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email from Axxess Counsel 12-29-2022, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Case - Weese v L-3, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Case - Schnuelle v C and C, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Case - Will v Parsons)(Velandia, Hilary)
April 10, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Velandia, Hilary)
April 6, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #19 Reply in Part filed by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (Groves, Charles)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ~ Granting #21 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Leave to File Surreply. Plaintiffs sur-reply is due no later than April 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/5/2023. (dwl)
April 4, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition of Doc 15 by All Plaintiffs. (Velandia, Hilary)
April 4, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #19 Reply in Part by All Plaintiffs. (Velandia, Hilary)
March 31, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY by Defendant Axxess Technology Solutions Inc re #15 MOTION, #18 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (Groves, Charles)
March 24, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment and To Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Affidavit of Lola Edwards, CEO, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Letter to Axxess w Complaint and Mediation Filing 11-17-2022, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 Mediation Request 11-17-2022, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 Email from AA to Axxess w Complaint and Mediation Request 12-05-2022, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 AAA Ltr Setting PreMediation Conference, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 Axxess request to reschedule PreMediation Conference, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 Email from Choice Hospice Request Any Alleged Agreement, #9 Exhibit Ex 8 Email from Choice Disputing Application of Website, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 Joint Statement re No Agreement to Mediate, #11 Exhibit Ex 10 Email from Axxess with Alleged Agreement 2-26-2023, #12 Exhibit Ex 11 Unpublished Case - Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line)(Velandia, Hilary)
March 24, 2023 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell D Blackburn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blackburn, Mitchell)
March 22, 2023 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E Stall on behalf of Axxess Technology Solutions Inc (Stall, Joseph)
March 3, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to Vacate Default Judgment and to Dismiss by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc.(Groves, Charles) Modified on 3/6/2023 to correct filing event to reflect that this filing is a motion(rr).
January 4, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Neighborhood Hospice LLC dba Complete Hospice Care of Southern Oklahoma. (Velandia, Hilary)
January 4, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Three Rivers Consulting and Management LLC dba Complete Hospice Care of Eastern Oklahoma. (Velandia, Hilary)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Family Choice Hospice LLC dba Complete Hospice Care. (Velandia, Hilary)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Choice Hospice Inc dba Complete Hospice Care of Oklahoma City. (Velandia, Hilary)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT ~ Pursuant to the Order filed separately this same date, default judgment is entered for Plaintiffs and against Defendant. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/4/2023. (dwl)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ~ Granting #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, as more fully set out in the Order. A separate judgment will enter. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/4/2023. (dwl)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary L Velandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Velandia, Hilary)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Velandia, Hilary)
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT ~ re #5 Motion for Entry of Default. The Court has examined the record and finds that Defendant Axxess Technology Solutions, Inc. was served with process on November 7, 2022, via certified mail [Doc. Nos. 4-5] but failed to respond or otherwise takeany action. Defendant is therefore in default. (dwl)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Servicemembers Civil Relief Act)(Velandia, Hilary)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Family Choice Hospice LLC. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc served on 11/7/2022. (Velandia, Hilary)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Choice Hospice Inc in the amount of $402, receipt number OKW500092609 regarding #1 Complaint (dtb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (dtb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Axxess Technology Solutions Inc filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choice Hospice Inc et al v. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Rivers Consulting and Management LLC
Represented By: Hilary L Velandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Hospice Inc an Okllahoma Corporation doing business as Complete Hospice Care Of Oklahoma City
Represented By: Hilary L Velandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Choice Hospice LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Complete Hospice Care
Represented By: Hilary L Velandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Hospice Care of Eastern Oklahoma
Represented By: Hilary L Velandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Hospice LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Complete Hospice Care of Southern Oklahoma
Represented By: Hilary L Velandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?